OJO v. AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Plaintiff: JOYCE T OJO
Defendant: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv16003
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC..(KORNBREK, CLIFFORD)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 11/8/2021. The parties shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/27/2021. (jqb, )
August 27, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/15/2021. (ams, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc... (KORNBREK, CLIFFORD)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KERSTEN KORTBAWI on behalf of AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (KORTBAWI, KERSTEN)
August 26, 2021 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.. (KORNBREK, CLIFFORD)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. identifying Honda Motor Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (KORNBREK, CLIFFORD)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. from N.J. Super. - Passaic County, case number PAS-L-2233-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12746685), filed by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KORNBREK, CLIFFORD)
August 25, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OJO v. AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE T OJO
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOHN ABEEL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Represented By: CLIFFORD BRIAN KORNBREK
Represented By: KERSTEN KORTBAWI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?