AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST v. AMANATRADE, LLC
Plaintiff: AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST
Defendant: AMANATRADE LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv16146
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading; The deadline for the Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint shall be extended to December 27, 2021, re #8 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/29/2021. (qa, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading by AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST. (WALLER, MICHAEL)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST. AMANATRADE LLC served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (WALLER, MICHAEL)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DANA B. PARKER on behalf of AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST (PARKER, DANA)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 AO120 Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (qa, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMANATRADE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
August 27, 2021 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Completed Form AO 120 by AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST. (WALLER, MICHAEL)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST. (WALLER, MICHAEL)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMANATRADE LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12752553), filed by AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for Amana Mutual Funds Trust v. AmanaTrade, LLC Verified Complaint)(WALLER, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST v. AMANATRADE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST
Represented By: MICHAEL E. WALLER
Represented By: DANA B. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANATRADE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?