FASANO v. MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FASANO
Defendant: MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC., J.D. PARKER, HESSAM NADJI, JOHN DOES 1-10, JANE DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv16395
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter request to adjourn the return date as to #4 Motion to dismiss through 11/15/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/20/2021. (lag, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Jocelyn A. Merced, Esq., withdrawing request for adjournment - Superior Court Trial is Adjourned.. (MERCED, JOCELYN)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Philip E. Stern. (STERN, PHILIP)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Jocelyn A. Merced, Esq., requesting an adjournment of pending Motion to Dismiss for one cycle to November 15, 2021. re #11 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #10 Order. (MERCED, JOCELYN)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3), or Alternatively to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit)(STERN, PHILIP)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter request that the #4 motion to dismiss return date be moved forward by one motion cycle to 11/1/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/15/2021. (lag, ) Modified on 10/19/2021 (lag, ).
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Philip E. Stern. (STERN, PHILIP)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Jocelyn A. Merced. (MERCED, JOCELYN)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Jocelyn A. Merced, Esq.. (MERCED, JOCELYN)
September 28, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3), or Alternatively to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER scheduling Telephone Conference on 11/8/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/24/2021. (lag, )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER scheduling a Telephone Conference on 11/8/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/24/2021. (lag, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3), or Alternatively to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC., HESSAM NADJI, J.D. PARKER. Responses due by 10/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MERCED, JOCELYN)
September 7, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HESSAM NADJI, J.D. PARKER, MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/22/2021. (lag, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc.; Hessam Nadji and J.D. Parker.. (MERCED, JOCELYN)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC. identifying Marcus & Millichap, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MERCED, JOCELYN)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HESSAM NADJI, J.D. PARKER, MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number BER-L-4354-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12767524), filed by HESSAM NADJI, J.D. PARKER, MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MERCED, JOCELYN)
September 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FASANO v. MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FASANO
Represented By: PHILIP E. STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JOCELYN ANNISE MERCED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. PARKER
Represented By: JOCELYN ANNISE MERCED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HESSAM NADJI
Represented By: JOCELYN ANNISE MERCED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?