KATSERMAN et al v. NAVAHRUTSKI
Plaintiff: NATAN KATSERMAN and IGOR GORBACH
3Rd Party Plaintiff: IGOR NAVAHRUTSKI
3Rd Party Defendant: Colonial Valley Transportation, Inc., UA Logistics Inc, NLN Trucking, Inc., Gorbach Trucking Inc. and BFX Loggistic Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv16531
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IGOR NAVAHRUTSKI. (KAMINSKY, ANTON)
October 27, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #15 Answer to Complaint filed by Anton Kaminsky on 10/22/2021 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (qa, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by IGOR NAVAHRUTSKI re #15 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, to substitute unsigned signature page (KAMINSKY, ANTON)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Colonial Valley Transportation, Inc., UA Logistics Inc, NLN Trucking, Inc., Gorbach Trucking Inc., BFX Loggistic Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against IGOR GORBACH, NATAN KATSERMAN by IGOR NAVAHRUTSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certification)(KAMINSKY, ANTON)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT that Igor Navahrutski's response is due 10/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/7/2021. (sm)
October 7, 2021 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #13 submitted by IGOR GORBACH has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/25/2021. (sm)
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time to Respond by IGOR NAVAHRUTSKI. (KAMINSKY, ANTON)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINT. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/4/2021. (sm)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #8 Order to Show Cause Stipulated Order for the Issuance of a Preliminary Inunction and Temporary Restraint by IGOR GORBACH, NATAN KATSERMAN. (GOLDIN, JEFFREY)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTON KAMINSKY on behalf of IGOR NAVAHRUTSKI (KAMINSKY, ANTON)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, dated September 24, 2021 [D.E. 8] served on Igor Navahrutski on September 24, 2021, filed by IGOR GORBACH, NATAN KATSERMAN. (FRANK, ALAN)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Defendant appear and show cause on 10/13/2021 at 12:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 5C before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Show Cause Response due by 10/8/2021. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/24/2021. (sm)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order dated 9/22/2021; Summons & Complaint, dated 9/8/2021, Brief inn Support of Plaintiff Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction, dated 9/14/2021 and Emergency Motion for A Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, dated 9/21/2021 served on Igor Navahrutski on September 22, 2021, filed by IGOR GORBACH, NATAN KATSERMAN. (FRANK, ALAN)
September 22, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #4 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion for Alternative Service re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs, Natan Katserman and Igor Gorbach Brief in Support of EMERGENCY Application for Temp, #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Igor Navahrutski, #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs, Natan Katserman and Igor Gorbach Brief in Support of EMERGENCY Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Igor Navahrutski. Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
September 22, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by J. GOLDIN on 9/14/21 was submitted with no Notice of Motion attached. For future reference, a Notice of Motion page should be included when filing a Motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (bt, )
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiffs' Motion; that within 3 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall serve Defendant, Igor Navahrutski via first class mail, return receipt requested, with a copy of the Summons, Complaint and Plaintiffs' Emergency Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Igor Navahrutski. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/21/2021. (sm)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Igor Navahrutski by IGOR GORBACH, NATAN KATSERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Order, #3 Exhibit A-Stock Purchase Agreement, #4 Exhibit B-Consulting Agreement, #5 Exhibit C-Assignment of Management, #6 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Karim Zahriy, #7 Exhibit E-Affidavit of Nathan Katserman, #8 Exhibit E-1 - transactions, #9 Exhibit E-2 - email, #10 Exhibit E-3 - transactions, #11 Exhibit F - Proof of Delivery UPS, #12 Exhibit G-Registration Cab Card, #13 Exhibit H-Affidavit of Igor Gorbach, #14 Exhibit H-1 - email, #15 Exhibit H-2 - wire, #16 Exhibit H-3 transaction)(FRANK, ALAN)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion for Alternative Service re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs, Natan Katserman and Igor Gorbach Brief in Support of EMERGENCY Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Igor Navahrutski Emergency Motion for Alternative Service by IGOR GORBACH, NATAN KATSERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Alan Frank, #4 Exhibit 1-copy of Complaint, #5 Exhibit 2-Dropbox link, #6 Exhibit 3-Affidavit of Non-Service)(FRANK, ALAN)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs, Natan Katserman and Igor Gorbach Brief in Support of EMERGENCY Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Igor Navahrutski by IGOR GORBACH, NATAN KATSERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A -Stock Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit B-Consulting Agreement, #4 Exhibit C-assignment of Management & Operations Agreement, #5 Exhibit D-Affidavit of KarimZahriya, #6 Exhibit E-Affidavit of Nathan Katserman, #7 Exhibit E-1 Transactions, #8 Exhibit E-2 Email, #9 Exhibit E-3 Transaction History, #10 Exhibit F-UPS Proof of Delivery, #11 Exhibit G-Registration Cab Card, #12 Exhibit H-Affidavit of Igor Gorbach, #13 Exhibit H-1 -Email, #14 Exhibit H-2 Domestic Wire transfer, #15 Exhibit H-3 Transaction History)(GOLDIN, JEFFREY) Modified on 9/22/2021 (bt, ).
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to IGOR NAVAHRUTSKI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
September 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IGOR NAVAHRUTSKI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12774995), filed by NATAN KATSERMAN, IGOR GORBACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(GOLDIN, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KATSERMAN et al v. NAVAHRUTSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATAN KATSERMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY J. GOLDIN
Represented By: ALAN LEE FRANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IGOR GORBACH
Represented By: JEFFREY J. GOLDIN
Represented By: ALAN LEE FRANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: IGOR NAVAHRUTSKI
Represented By: ANTON KAMINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Colonial Valley Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: UA Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: NLN Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gorbach Trucking Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BFX Loggistic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?