MUHAMMAD v. GOLDSTEIN et al
Plaintiff: DONALD ABDULLAH MUHAMMAD
Defendant: DR. CRAIG GOLDSTEIN, REBECCA, SMITH and DAVITA
Case Number: 2:2021cv16537
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that this action is DISMISSED and that this case shall be CLOSED.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/22/2021. (ld, )
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and request for documents by DONALD ABDULLAH MUHAMMAD. (ld, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and request for documents. Motion set for 11/15/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter request for 4 blank subpoena forms from DONALD ABDULLAH MUHAMMAD. (ld, )
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is GRANTED; that Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/16/2021. (ld, )
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/16/2021. (ld, )
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se. (wh)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Form for Consent to Receive Electronic Notifications, #5 Proposed Order on IFP, #6 Envelope)(wh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUHAMMAD v. GOLDSTEIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD ABDULLAH MUHAMMAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. CRAIG GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVITA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?