DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC et al
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC and NEAL PATEL
Case Number: 2:2021cv16597
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/3/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/2/21. (jbb)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC. (BUTERICK, BRETT)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC, NEAL PATEL.(BUTERICK, BRETT)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; that Defendants shall serve and file an Answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, on or before Friday, October 29, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 10/8/2021. (ld, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC, NEAL PATEL. (BUTERICK, BRETT)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRETT MICHAEL BUTERICK on behalf of OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC, NEAL PATEL (BUTERICK, BRETT)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021; NEAL PATEL served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC, NEAL PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (GATTONI, WILLIAM)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC, NEAL PATEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12780153), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)
September 7, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR.
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OM HOTELS ABERCORN LLC
Represented By: BRETT MICHAEL BUTERICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEAL PATEL
Represented By: BRETT MICHAEL BUTERICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?