KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICE INC. et al v. KERANIQUE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kosher Supervision Service Inc. and Kosher Supervision Service Inc. d/b/a Kof-K Kosher Supervision
Defendant: Keranique, LLC, International Hair Institute, LLC and Leceur Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv16868
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ARI N. ROTHMAN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/3/2021. (ld, )
November 3, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT V OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JAN MEYER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MEYER, JAN)
November 2, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by INTERNATIONAL HAIR INSTITUTE, LLC, KERANIQUE, LLC re #13 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT V OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT (BOYLE, PATRICK)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT V OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT by INTERNATIONAL HAIR INSTITUTE, LLC, KERANIQUE, LLC. Responses due by 12/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BOYLE, PATRICK)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT; that the Court allow Defendants additional time, up to and including November 2, 2021, in which to file their answer or responsive motion to plaintiffs' amended complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/27/2021. (ld, )
October 27, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #11 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by INTERNATIONAL HAIR INSTITUTE, LLC, KERANIQUE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Ari N. Rothman, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit NV Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit Ohio Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed Order])(BOYLE, PATRICK)
October 25, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Amended Complaint. Motion set for 11/15/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Amended Complaint, by INTERNATIONAL HAIR INSTITUTE, LLC, KERANIQUE, LLC. (BOYLE, PATRICK)
October 13, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, ; that the Court allow defendants additional time, up to and including November 2, 2021, in which to file its answer or responsive motion to plaintiff's complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/12/2021. (ld, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL HAIR INSTITUTE, LLC, KERANIQUE, LLC, LECEUR LTD., filed by KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICE INC., KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICE INC. d/b/a KOF-K KOSHER SUPERVISION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ELEM, RICHARD)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by INTERNATIONAL HAIR INSTITUTE, LLC, KERANIQUE, LLC. (BOYLE, PATRICK)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICE INC., KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICE INC. d/b/a KOF-K KOSHER SUPERVISION. INTERNATIONAL HAIR INSTITUTE, LLC served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ELEM, RICHARD)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICE INC., KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICE INC. d/b/a KOF-K KOSHER SUPERVISION. KERANIQUE, LLC served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ELEM, RICHARD)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to INTERNATIONAL HAIR INSTITUTE, LLC, KERANIQUE, LLC, LECEUR LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT) (ld, )
September 14, 2021 Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kosher Supervision Service Inc., Kosher Supervision Service Inc. d/b/a Kof-K Kosher Supervision identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (ELEM, RICHARD)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Hair Institute, LLC, Keranique, LLC, Leceur Ltd. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12796522) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Kosher Supervision Service Inc., Kosher Supervision Service Inc. d/b/a Kof-K Kosher Supervision. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ELEM, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOSHER SUPERVISION SERVICE INC. et al v. KERANIQUE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kosher Supervision Service Inc.
Represented By: RICHARD LEVI ELEM
Represented By: JAN MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kosher Supervision Service Inc. d/b/a Kof-K Kosher Supervision
Represented By: RICHARD LEVI ELEM
Represented By: JAN MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keranique, LLC
Represented By: PATRICK J. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hair Institute, LLC
Represented By: PATRICK J. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leceur Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?