CAREY-LAYLOR v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: Shonnette Carey-Laylor
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, TRANS UNION, LLC and VW CREDIT INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv16953
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement.( Administrative Termination deadline set for 1/8/2022). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/9/2021. (ams, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement by SHONNETTE CAREY-LAYLOR (BOROOSAN, MOSHE)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 2:30 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 2/22/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/5/2021. (jqb, )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's ComplaintFirst MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES. Responses due by 11/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BROWNSTEIN, BORIS)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for VCI to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through 11/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/26/2021. (ams, )
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter from Jared M. DeBona. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(DEBONA, JARED)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by VW CREDIT INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/26/2021. (ams, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney JARED M. DEBONA for VW CREDIT INC. added. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DEBONA, JARED)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VW CREDIT INC. identifying Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.; Volkswagen AG as Corporate Parent.. (DEBONA, JARED)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter requesting an extension of time until 11/1/2021 for Equifax Information Services, LLC to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/7/2021. (ams, )
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from Equifax Information Services LLC requesting Extension of Time to File Answer w/ Plaintiff's Counsel's Consent re #1 Complaint,. (BROWNSTEIN, BORIS)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BORIS BROWNSTEIN on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES (BROWNSTEIN, BORIS)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC identifying TransUnion and TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GREEN, CASEY)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by TRANS UNION, LLC. (GREEN, CASEY)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY B. GREEN on behalf of TRANS UNION, LLC (GREEN, CASEY)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHONNETTE CAREY-LAYLOR. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021; TRANS UNION, LLC served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021; VW CREDIT INC. served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service (TransUnion), #2 Proof of Service (VW Credit))(BOROOSAN, MOSHE)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, TRANS UNION, LLC, VW CREDIT INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by Shonnette Carey-Laylor as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, TRANS UNION, LLC, VW CREDIT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons (TransUnion), #2 Proposed Summons (VW Credit))(BOROOSAN, MOSHE)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, TRANS UNION, LLC, VW CREDIT INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12800487) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Shonnette Carey-Laylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BOROOSAN, MOSHE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAREY-LAYLOR v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonnette Carey-Laylor
Represented By: MOSHE O BOROOSAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES
Represented By: BORIS BROWNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: CASEY B. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VW CREDIT INC.
Represented By: JARED M. DEBONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?