GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. ATLANTIC SPINE CENTER, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: ATLANTIC SPINE CENTER, L.L.C., ADVANCED SPINE AND OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, L.L.C., OUTPATIENT USA, L.L.C, KAIXUAN LIU, M.D., JASON ARORA, D.O., KALIQ CHANG, M.D.,, PRAVEEN KADIMCHERLA, M.D., VALDONE E. KNEPA, M.D. and AMIT A. SHAH, M.D.
Case Number: 2:2021cv17220
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #13 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/2/2021. (bt, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. (KANG, GENE)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE REPLY FORDEFENDANTS; One extension has been granted until October 28, 2021; Time to Answer is hereby extended for all above-referenced defendants until November 4, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/22/2021. (ld, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER by All Defendants. (ARIANS, E.)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. VALDONE E. KNEPA, M.D. served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
October 12, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PRAVEEN KADIMCHERLA, M.D., ATLANTIC SPINE CENTER, L.L.C. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/28/2021. (bt, )
October 12, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMIT A. SHAH, M.D. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/30/2021. (bt, )
October 12, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KAIXUAN LIU, M.D. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/1/2021. (bt, )
October 12, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ADVANCED SPINE AND OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, L.L.C., OUTPATIENT USA, L.L.C has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/28/2021. (bt, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Kaixuan Liu, MD.. (ARIANS, E.)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amit A. Shah, MD.. (ARIANS, E.)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Atlantic Spine Center, L.L.C., Praveen Kadimcherla, MD.. (ARIANS, E.)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Outpatient USA, L.L.C., Advanced Spine and Outpatient Surgery Center, L.L.C... (ARIANS, E.)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by E. VICKI ARIANS on behalf of All Defendants (ARIANS, E.)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. ADVANCED SPINE AND OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, L.L.C. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021; ATLANTIC SPINE CENTER, L.L.C. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021; PRAVEEN KADIMCHERLA, M.D. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021; KAIXUAN LIU, M.D. served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021; OUTPATIENT USA, L.L.C served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021; AMIT A. SHAH, M.D. served on 9/25/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Atlantic Spine Center, L.L.C., #2 Summons Returned Executed on Praveen Kadimcherla, M.D., #3 Summons Returned Executed on Kaixuan Liu, M.D., #4 Summons Returned Executed on Outpatient USA, L.L.C., #5 Summons Returned Executed on Amit A. Shah, M.D., #6 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PRAVEEN KADIMCHERLA, M.D., VALDONE E. KNEPA, M.D., KAIXUAN LIU, M.D., OUTPATIENT USA, L.L.C, AMIT A. SHAH, M.D.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
September 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADVANCED SPINE AND OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, L.L.C., JASON ARORA, D.O., ATLANTIC SPINE CENTER, L.L.C., KALIQ CHANG, M.D.,, PRAVEEN KADIMCHERLA, M.D., VALDONE E. KNEPA, M.D., KAIXUAN LIU, M.D., OUTPATIENT USA, L.L.C, AMIT A. SHAH, M.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12816318) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2", #3 Exhibit "3", #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KANG, GENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. ATLANTIC SPINE CENTER, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC SPINE CENTER, L.L.C.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED SPINE AND OUTPATIENT SURGERY CENTER, L.L.C.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OUTPATIENT USA, L.L.C
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAIXUAN LIU, M.D.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON ARORA, D.O.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KALIQ CHANG, M.D.,
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRAVEEN KADIMCHERLA, M.D.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALDONE E. KNEPA, M.D.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMIT A. SHAH, M.D.
Represented By: E. VICKI ARIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?