BUCCI v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL AND MARGARET BUCCI and MICHAEL BUCCI AND MARGARET BUCCI
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, XYZ INSURANCE COMPANIES 1-10 and ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2021cv17328
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Joint Discovery Plan by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA.(CORONATO, WILFRED)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Arbitration case set for 11/23/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/27/2021. (spc)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA.(CORONATO, WILFRED)
September 22, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
September 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. from Union County Superior Court, Law Division, case number UNN-L-2847-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12823387), filed by ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUCCI v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL AND MARGARET BUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BUCCI AND MARGARET BUCCI
Represented By: MICHAEL C. VACCARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: WILFRED P. CORONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: WILFRED P. CORONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ INSURANCE COMPANIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: WILFRED P. CORONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?