CENTENE CORPORATION et al v. MERCK & COMPANY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CENTENE CORPORATION, WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS. INC., NEW YORK QUALITY HEALTHCARE CORPORATION dba FIDELIS CARE, HEALTH NET, LLC and NEW YORK QUALITY HEALTHCARE CORPORATION doing business as FIDELIS CARE
Defendant: MERCK & COMPANY, INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION, SCHERING CORPORATION and GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Case Number: 2:2021cv17363
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Eastern District of Virginia - as case 2:21-cv-01008, filed 10/19/2021. (km)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Eastern District of Virginia. (MDL 2836 In Re: Zetia (Ezetimibe) Antitrust Litigation) (gh, )
October 18, 2021 Case extracted via ECF to the Eastern District of Virginia. (gh, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by CENTENE CORPORATION, HEALTH NET, LLC, NEW YORK QUALITY HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS. INC. [Notice of Tag-Along and Request to Transfer to an MDL] (Attachments: #1 Ex. A to Notice of Tag-Along and Request to Transfer.)(CHAKRABARTI, PREETHA)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., MERCK & COMPANY, INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, SCHERING CORPORATION, SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
September 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW YORK QUALITY HEALTHCARE CORPORATION dba FIDELIS CARE identifying CENTENE CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (CHAKRABARTI, PREETHA)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS. INC. identifying CENTENE CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (CHAKRABARTI, PREETHA)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEALTH NET, LLC identifying CENTENE CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (CHAKRABARTI, PREETHA)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTENE CORPORATION identifying The Vanguard Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CHAKRABARTI, PREETHA)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., MERCK & COMPANY, INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, SCHERING CORPORATION, SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12824651) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NEW YORK QUALITY HEALTHCARE CORPORATION dba FIDELIS CARE, WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS. INC., CENTENE CORPORATION, HEALTH NET, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHAKRABARTI, PREETHA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTENE CORPORATION et al v. MERCK & COMPANY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTENE CORPORATION
Represented By: PREETHA CHAKRABARTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS. INC.
Represented By: PREETHA CHAKRABARTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW YORK QUALITY HEALTHCARE CORPORATION dba FIDELIS CARE
Represented By: PREETHA CHAKRABARTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH NET, LLC
Represented By: PREETHA CHAKRABARTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW YORK QUALITY HEALTHCARE CORPORATION doing business as FIDELIS CARE
Represented By: PREETHA CHAKRABARTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHERING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?