RAMADY REALTY v. EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: RAMADY REALTY and RAMADA REALTY, LLC
Defendant: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY and MARKEL SERVICE INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv17444
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/6/2021. (seb)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/1/2021. (ams, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL SERVICE INC. re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty), #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty), #5 Answer to Complaint (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL SERVICE INC..(VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKEL SERVICE INC. identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL SERVICE INC.. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
September 28, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (JB, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MARKEL SERVICE INC., EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Passaic County Superior Court, case number PAS-L-2727-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12828797), filed by MARKEL SERVICE INC., EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
September 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMADY REALTY v. EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMADY REALTY
Represented By: STEVEN MATTHEW DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMADA REALTY, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN MATTHEW DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: APRIL T. VILLAVERDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKEL SERVICE INC.
Represented By: APRIL T. VILLAVERDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?