DA COSTA et al v. US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (USCIS)
Plaintiff: JOAO CARNEIRO DA COSTA, TIAGO CATELA DA COSTA and MARIA CODINHO CATELA DA COSTA
Defendant: US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (USCIS)
Case Number: 2:2021cv17657
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1156
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIA CODINHO CATELA DA COSTA, TIAGO CATELA DA COSTA, JOAO CARNEIRO DA COSTA. US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (USCIS) served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (PEACOCK, WILLIAM)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ENES HAJDARPASIC on behalf of US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (USCIS) (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
October 4, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MARIO R. URIZAR, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (USCIS). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
October 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice MARIO URIZAR. Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Admitting Mario R. Urizar Pro Hac Vice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/29/2021. (lag, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice MARIO URIZAR to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12839576.) (PEACOCK, WILLIAM)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice MARIO URIZAR by JOAO CARNEIRO DA COSTA, Maria Godinho Catela Da Costa, Tiago Catela Da Costa. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PEACOCK, WILLIAM)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12839370), filed by Maria Godinho Catela Da Costa, Tiago Catela Da Costa, Joao Carneiro Da Costa. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(PEACOCK, WILLIAM)
September 27, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
September 27, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DA COSTA et al v. US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (USCIS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAO CARNEIRO DA COSTA
Represented By: WILLIAM C PEACOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIAGO CATELA DA COSTA
Represented By: WILLIAM C PEACOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA CODINHO CATELA DA COSTA
Represented By: WILLIAM C PEACOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (USCIS)
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?