BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC. v. SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD.
Plaintiff: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC. doing business as JANET COLLECTION and BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC. doing business as JANET COLLECTION, a New Jersey Corporation
Defendant: SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD. doing business as OUTRE and SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD. doing business as OUTRE, a New York Corporation
Counter Claimant: SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD.
Counter Defendant: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv17763
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Beauty Plus Trading Co., Inc... (CHOI, JOHN)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION. Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-17763 and Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-17767 shall be consolidated; Any future filings that are generally applicable to the consolidated actions shall be filed within Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-17763; Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-17767 shall not be closed, as it will remain open for case-specific filings. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/23/2021. (ams, )
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 12:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 1/14/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/16/2021. (jqb, )
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from William W. Stroever, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order /Stipulation for Consolidation)(STROEVER, WILLIAM)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC. by SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(STROEVER, WILLIAM)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM WALLACE STROEVER on behalf of SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD. (STROEVER, WILLIAM)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter requesting an extension of time until 11/9/2021 for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/26/2021. (ams, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Sun Taiyang Co., Ltd. d/b/a Outre. Attorney EMILY PARK for SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD. added. (PARK, EMILY)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC.. SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD. served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (CHOI, JOHN)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (ams, )
September 30, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC.. (CHOI, JOHN)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12846269) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHOI, JOHN) Modified on 9/29/2021 (ams, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC. v. SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC. doing business as JANET COLLECTION
Represented By: JOHN HOON CHOI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC. doing business as JANET COLLECTION, a New Jersey Corporation
Represented By: JOHN HOON CHOI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD. doing business as OUTRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD. doing business as OUTRE, a New York Corporation
Represented By: EMILY PARK
Represented By: WILLIAM WALLACE STROEVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: SUN TAIYANG CO., LTD.
Represented By: EMILY PARK
Represented By: WILLIAM WALLACE STROEVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING, CO., INC.
Represented By: JOHN HOON CHOI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?