AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC. v. D MART RUTHERFORD LLC et al
Plaintiff: AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.
Defendant: D MART RUTHERFORD LLC doing business as D MART FARMERS MARKET, KSC IMPEX TRADING, INC., KAJAL CHAHAL, JOHN DOES 1-10 and RICHARD ROES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv17794
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.. Responses due by 11/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Counsel in Support of Motion for Final Judgment by Default Against Defendants, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FASSETT, DAVID)
October 27, 2021 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants D. Mart Rutherford, LLC, KSC Impex Trading, Inc. and Kajal Chahal for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (JB, )
October 27, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Request for Entry of Default filed by D. FASSETT on 10/26/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, please refer to the event "Request for Default." This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (JB, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.. (FASSETT, DAVID)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.. KAJAL CHAHAL served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021; D MART RUTHERFORD LLC served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021; KSC IMPEX TRADING, INC. served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (FASSETT, DAVID)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KAJAL CHAHAL, D MART RUTHERFORD LLC, KSC IMPEX TRADING, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KAJAL CHAHAL, D MART RUTHERFORD LLC, d/b/a D MART FARMERS MARKET, JOHN DOES 1-10, KSC IMPEX TRADING, INC., RICHARD ROES 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12847689), filed by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons D Mart Rutherford LLC d/b/a D Mart Farmers Market, #3 Summons KSC Impex Trading, Inc., #4 Summons Kajal Chahal)(FASSETT, DAVID)
September 29, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC. v. D MART RUTHERFORD LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC.
Represented By: DAVID W. FASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D MART RUTHERFORD LLC doing business as D MART FARMERS MARKET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSC IMPEX TRADING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAJAL CHAHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?