ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC v. WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. et al
Plaintiff: ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC
Defendant: WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., ARCH REINSURANCE CO. and ARCH CAPTIALGROUP LTD
Case Number: 2:2021cv18090
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by ARCH REINSURANCE CO., WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Shane T. Calendar In Support, #4 Exhibit A to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #5 Exhibit B to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #6 Exhibit C to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #7 Exhibit D to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #8 Exhibit E to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #9 Exhibit F to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #10 Exhibit G to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #11 Exhibit H to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #12 Exhibit I to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #13 Exhibit J to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #14 Exhibit K to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #15 Exhibit L to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #16 Exhibit M to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #17 Exhibit N to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #18 Exhibit O to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #19 Exhibit P to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #20 Exhibit Q to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #21 Exhibit R to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #22 Exhibit S to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #23 Exhibit T to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #24 Exhibit U to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #25 Exhibit V to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #26 Exhibit W to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #27 Exhibit X to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #28 Exhibit Y to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #29 Exhibit Z to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #30 Exhibit AA to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #31 Exhibit BB to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #32 Exhibit CC to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #33 Exhibit DD to Certification of Shane T. Calendar, #34 Exhibit EE to Certification of Shane T. Calendar)(CALENDAR, SHANE)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MICHAEL A. KNOERZER ESQ etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/17/2021. (bt, )
November 16, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Knoerzer, Esq.. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
November 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Knoerzer, Esq. by WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael A. Knoerzer, Esq. In Support, #2 Certification of Shane Calendar In Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CALENDAR, SHANE)
November 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by SHANE THOMAS CALENDAR on behalf of WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CALENDAR, SHANE)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARCH CAPTIALGROUP LTD, ARCH REINSURANCE CO., WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC as to ARCH CAPTIALGROUP LTD. (PEREZ, JASON)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC. (HARRISON, DAVID)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC. (HARRISON, DAVID)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARCH CAPTIALGROUP LTD, ARCH REINSURANCE CO., WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID BUTLER HARRISON on behalf of ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC (HARRISON, DAVID)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC. (HARRISON, DAVID)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12866588) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HARRISON, DAVID)
October 5, 2021 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC v. WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENTERTAINMENT RISK, LLC
Represented By: DAVID BUTLER HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: SHANE THOMAS CALENDAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH REINSURANCE CO.
Represented By: SHANE THOMAS CALENDAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH CAPTIALGROUP LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?