Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC v. Edison Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Edison Properties, LLC, Edison Construction Management, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano and UA Builders Corp.
Case Number: 2:2021cv18267
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 0541
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 35 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02682. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 8, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Sever. Severance and transfer of the claims arising out of the New Jersey Project are appropriate here. There is no connection between the claims alleged in connection with the New Jersey Project and those alleged in connection with the New York Project. Plaintiffs do not allege that the same allegedly fraudulent statements led them to enter into the two subcontracts; instead, they allege that one set of allegedly false statements led them to enter the subcontract in connection with the New Jersey Project; they do not allege at all that they were induced by any particular fraudulent statement to enter the subcontract for the New York Project. Other than the identity of Edison, who was not a party to either of the allegedly breached contracts, there is no connection between the claims related to the New York Project and the claims related to the New Jersey Project. They arise out of separate subcontracts for separate work on separate projects. Accordingly, there are not common questions of law or fact that would resolve both claims. The Edison Defendants are all based in New Jersey, except for Pipia, with respect to whom there are no allegations connected to the New Jersey Project, and all events giving rise to the claims connected with the New Jersey Project occurred in New Jersey. There will be no prejudice to the Defendants will be avoided if the case is litigated in New Jersey, where all Defendants connected to the New Jersey Project are based. The claims arising out the New Jersey Project as thus more appropriately resolved in a New Jersey forum, and accordingly those claims are severed and transferred. The motion for severance and transfer is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/1/2021) (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
August 23, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robyn Katerina Lym on behalf of Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano..(Lym, Robyn)
August 6, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. . Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Ansell, Michael)
June 30, 2021 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Ralph N. Gaboury, Esq. in Opposition re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.. Document filed by Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Adjournment Request).(Gaboury, Ralph)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Rosaria A. Suriano to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (epb)
June 22, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for Rosaria A. Suriano to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24696470. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Michael H. Ansell, Esq. in Support re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Counsel to supplement record).(Ansell, Michael)
June 21, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Rosaria A. Suriano to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24696470. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order).(Suriano, Rosaria)
June 2, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Michael H. Ansell, Esq. in Support re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Reply Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit B to Reply Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit C to Reply Declaration of Counsel).(Ansell, Michael)
June 2, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. . Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Court re consent for filing overlength Reply Brief).(Ansell, Michael)
May 17, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. . Document filed by Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC..(Gaboury, Ralph)
May 17, 2021 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Joseph Novella in Opposition re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.. Document filed by Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC..(Gaboury, Ralph)
May 17, 2021 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Ralph N. Gaboury, Esq. in Opposition re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.. Document filed by Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Edison Properties Website).(Gaboury, Ralph)
May 15, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Michael H. Ansell, Esq. in Support re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Exhibit A to Declaration of Pasquale Suriano).(Ansell, Michael)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Reply brief due on June 2, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
May 12, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re Plaintiffs Further Request to Extend Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Ralph N. Gaboury dated 05/12/2021. Document filed by Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC..(Gaboury, Ralph)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter, filed by Edison Properties, LLC, Pasquale Suriano, Edison Construction Management, LLC, Joe Pipia. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/5/2021) (va)
May 5, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Michael H. Ansell, Esq. dated 05/05/2021 re: Memorializing parties agreement at Initial Scheduling Conference. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano..(Ansell, Michael)
April 30, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/30/2021 by Telephone Conference. Ralph Gaboury and Laleh Hawa present by telephone for Plaintiff. Michael Ansell present by telephone for Defendants, Edison Properties, LLC, Edison Construction Management, LLC, Joe Pipia, and Pasquale Suriano. Gregory Tuttle present by telephone for Defendant, UA Builders Corp. The hearing was recorded through the Court's teleconference line. Case management plan stayed pending decision on the motion to sever. Plaintiff's time to respond to the motion to sever is extended to May 14, 2021. Defendants reply due by May 28, 2021. (mf)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time for reasons stated on the record on April 30, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
April 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laleh Hawa on behalf of Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC..(Hawa, Laleh)
April 30, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Ralph N. Gaboury dated 04/30/2021. Document filed by Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC..(Gaboury, Ralph)
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC..(Gaboury, Ralph)
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ralph N. Gaboury on behalf of Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC..(Gaboury, Ralph)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference by Telephone set for 4/30/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/16/2021) (tro)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Michael H. Ansell, Esq. dated 04/07/2 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Michael H. Ansell, Esq. dated 04/07/2021. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano..(Ansell, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Olmsted Tuttle on behalf of UA Builders Corp...(Tuttle, Gregory)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Michael H. Ansell, Esq. in Support re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano..(Ansell, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Pasquale Suriano in Support re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Ansell, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Michael H. Ansell, Esq. in Support re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Green Star Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Green Star Proof of Claim).(Ansell, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. . Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano..(Ansell, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Sever , Transfer Venue, and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Joe Pipia, Pasquale Suriano..(Ansell, Michael)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ansell, Michael)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HNB Trust Company, LLC for Edison Properties, LLC. Document filed by Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC..(Ansell, Michael)
March 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael H Ansell. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
March 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael H Ansell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Joe Pipia. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
March 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael H Ansell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted. (dnh)
March 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 651345/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24321350).Document filed by Joe Pipia, Edison Construction Management, LLC, Edison Properties, LLC, Pasquale Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Green Star Proof of Claim, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #3 Affidavit of Service).(Ansell, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC v. Edison Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Star Energy Solutions, LLC
Represented By: LALEH HAWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Properties, LLC
Represented By: ROBYN KATERINA LYM
Represented By: ROSARIA A. SURIANO
Represented By: MICHAEL H. ANSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Construction Management, LLC
Represented By: ROBYN KATERINA LYM
Represented By: ROSARIA A. SURIANO
Represented By: MICHAEL H. ANSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Pipia
Represented By: ROBYN KATERINA LYM
Represented By: ROSARIA A. SURIANO
Represented By: MICHAEL H. ANSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasquale Suriano
Represented By: ROBYN KATERINA LYM
Represented By: ROSARIA A. SURIANO
Represented By: MICHAEL H. ANSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UA Builders Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?