K.K. v. PEQUANNOCK TWP. BOARD OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff: K.K. O/B/O G.R. and K.K.
Defendant: TWP. BD. OF EDUC. PEQUANNOCK and PEQUANNOCK TWP. BOARD OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv18351
Filed: October 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is withdrawn and the Clerk of Court shall mark this matter Closed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/9/2021. (sm)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (bt, )
October 10, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps) Modified on 10/12/2021 (ak).
October 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against K.K. O/B/O G.R., filed by K.K. O/B/O G.R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CANTY-BARNES, ESTHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.K. v. PEQUANNOCK TWP. BOARD OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.K. O/B/O G.R.
Represented By: ESTHER CANTY-BARNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.K.
Represented By: ESTHER CANTY-BARNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWP. BD. OF EDUC. PEQUANNOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEQUANNOCK TWP. BOARD OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?