GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Defendant: ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C. and DONALD RACEK, D.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv18618
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C., DONALD RACEK, D.C..(RANDOLPH, JEFFREY)
November 8, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by DONALD RACEK, D.C. andALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C., has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/26/2021. (jc, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to ____________________Alternative Health Center PC and Donald Racek, DC. Attorney JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH for ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C.,JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH for DONALD RACEK, D.C. added. (Attachments: #1 Appearance of counsel)(RANDOLPH, JEFFREY)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO.. ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C., DONALD RACEK, D.C. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
October 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C., DONALD RACEK, D.C. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12895443) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KANG, GENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTERNATIVE HEALTH CENTER, P.C.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD RACEK, D.C.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?