TIJERINA et al v. VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT et al
Plaintiff: Beatriz Tijerina, David Concepcin, Gina Aprile, Theresa Gillespie, Talina Henderson, Diana Ferrara, Lauren Daly, Shane McDonald, Kasem Curovic, Christa Callahan, Erica Upshur, Johnnie Moutra, Jennifer Tolbert, TIJERINA BEATRIZ and DAVID CONCEPCION
Defendant: Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv18755
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to class action complaint through 1/14/2022, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/18/2021. (lag, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by HOMER B. RAMSEY on behalf of VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting appointment of interim class counsel, etc. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/15/2021. (lag, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER)
November 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AYERS, CHRISTOPHER)
November 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Absent any objection, the proposed order regarding appointment of Interim Class Counsel will be executed on 11/12/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/08/2021. (lr, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, USDJ regarding appointment of Interim Class Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DIANA FERRARA, ERICA UPSHUR, GINA APRILE, LAUREN DALY, KASEM CUROVIC, JOHNNIE MOUTRA, DAVID CONCEPCION, SHANE MCDONALD, TIJERINA BEATRIZ, THERESA GILLESPIE, JENNIFER TOLBERT, CHRISTA CALLAHAN, TALINA HENDERSON. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
October 15, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE F. BARTLETT on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BARTLETT, CAROLINE)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12899191) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Diana Ferrara, Erica Upshur, Gina Aprile, Lauren Daly, Kasem Curovic, Johnnie Moutra, David Concepcin, Shane McDonald, Beatriz Tijerina, Theresa Gillespie, Jennifer Tolbert, Christa Callahan, Talina Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(CECCHI, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIJERINA et al v. VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Tijerina
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Concepcin
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Aprile
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Gillespie
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talina Henderson
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Ferrara
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Daly
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane McDonald
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasem Curovic
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Callahan
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Upshur
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Moutra
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Tolbert
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIJERINA BEATRIZ
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CONCEPCION
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: HOMER B. RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?