ZUFFA, LLC v. BELLO et al
Plaintiff: ZUFFA, LLC doing business as ULTIMATE FIGHTING CHAMPIONSHIP
Defendant: VIENNA BELLO and HUDSON BURGERS AND BEERS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv19008
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing this matter in its entirety, with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/12/2021. (ld, )
November 12, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ZUFFA, LLC (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (jc, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VIENNA BELLO, HUDSON BURGERS AND BEERS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by ZUFFA, LLC D/B/A ULTIMATE FIGHTING CHAMPIONSHIP REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING COPYRIGHT (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZUFFA, LLC D/B/A ULTIMATE FIGHTING CHAMPIONSHIP. (LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VIENNA BELLO, HUDSON BURGERS AND BEERS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12906390), filed by ZUFFA, LLC D/B/A ULTIMATE FIGHTING CHAMPIONSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons as to Deft Vienna Bello, #4 Summons Summons as to Deft Hudson Burgers and Beers, LLC)(LONSTEIN, WAYNE)
October 19, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZUFFA, LLC v. BELLO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZUFFA, LLC doing business as ULTIMATE FIGHTING CHAMPIONSHIP
Represented By: WAYNE D. LONSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIENNA BELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON BURGERS AND BEERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?