Gesture Technology Partners, LLC v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gesture Technology Partners, LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc and LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv19234
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 36 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jr)
October 22, 2021 Filing 35 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jr)
October 22, 2021 Filing 34 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-00123. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 22, 2021 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #32 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is stayed, and this action is transferred to theDistrict of New Jersey. After transfer, the Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
October 21, 2021 Filing 32 CORRECTED MOTION to Transfer Case by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael)
October 20, 2021 Filing 31 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #30 Stipulation (ir)
October 20, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simons, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Deadline by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC (Simons, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
August 6, 2021 Filing 27 Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Williams, Fred)
July 9, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Venue and Jurisdictional Discovery Regarding Defendant LG's Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC (Williams, Fred)
July 9, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Case Readiness Status Report by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC (Williams, Fred)
July 2, 2021 Filing 24 LG Electronics Inc.'s Answer and Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Patent Infringement by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Satchwell, Matthew)
July 2, 2021 Filing 23 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant LG's Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion to Transfer, #2 Affidavit Yoon Declaration)(Satchwell, Matthew)
June 30, 2021 Reset Deadlines: LG Electronics Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer due 7/2/2021. (lad)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including July 2, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
June 23, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
June 16, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
June 16, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Stephanie Lim ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14917583) by on behalf of LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
June 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Paul R. Steadman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14917564) by on behalf of LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Matthew D. Satchwell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14917537) by on behalf of LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party LG Electronics Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft) (Guaragna, John)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Came on for consideration is Plaintiffs Motion to Allow Chad Ennis (Mr. Ennis) to Withdraw As Counsel. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that Mr. Ennis is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. It is further ORDERED that the docket be amended to reflect that Mr. Ennis has withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs and no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Came on for consideration is Plaintiffs Motion to Allow Jonathan L. Hardt (Mr. Hardt) to Withdraw As Counsel. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that Mr. Hardt is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. It is further ORDERED that the docket be amended to reflect that Mr. Hardt has withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs and no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Came on for consideration is Plaintiffs Motion to Allow C. Matthew Rozier (Mr. Rozier) to Withdraw As Counsel. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that Mr. Rozier is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. It is further ORDERED that the docket be amended to reflect that Mr. Rozier has withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs and no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozier, C.)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardt, Jonathan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ennis, Chad)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendants to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall have up to and including May 27, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney C. Matthew Rozier for Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred I. Williams on behalf of C. Matthew Rozier ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14494562) by on behalf of Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics Inc.. (am)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (am)
February 5, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Williams, Fred)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Williams, Fred)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against LG Electronics Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14454208), filed by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gesture Technology Partners, LLC v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gesture Technology Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?