IWUANYANWU v. BLINKEN et al
Plaintiff: CHIOMA IRUKA IWUANYANWU
Defendant: ANTONY BLINKEN, MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, RICHARD C. VISEK, IAN G BROWNLEE, KATHLEEN FITZGIBBON and CLAIRE PIERANGELO
Case Number: 2:2021cv19267
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/15/2021. (lag, )
November 13, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Consent of Parties by ANTONY BLINKEN, IAN G BROWNLEE, KATHLEEN FITZGIBBON, MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, CLAIRE PIERANGELO, TRACY RENAUD, RICHARD C. VISEK, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ENES HAJDARPASIC on behalf of ANTONY BLINKEN, IAN G BROWNLEE, KATHLEEN FITZGIBBON, MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, CLAIRE PIERANGELO, TRACY RENAUD, RICHARD C. VISEK, CHRISTOPHER WRAY (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jr)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01733. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 22, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
October 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 10/21/2021. (hs)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' #5 Motion to Transfer and Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART AS MOOT. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the defendants seek the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith TERMINATE all remaining deadlines in this case and TRANSFER the case file to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Transfer due by 10/17/2021. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 7, 2021. (lcrbw1)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE CONSENT TO TRANSFER TO DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY by CHIOMA IRUKA IWUANYANWU (Goldstein, Joshua)
September 27, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply on support of its Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/23/2021. (hs)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's #6 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Memorandum, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before October 23, 2021, the plaintiff shall file her memorandum in support of her motion for summary judgment and in opposition to the defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 24, 2021. (lcrbw1)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey, or Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss by CHIOMA IRUKA IWUANYANWU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Joshua)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey, or Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss by ANTONY BLINKEN, IAN G. BROWNLEE, KATHLEEN FITZGIBBON, MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, CLAIRE PIERANGELO, TRACY RENAUD, RICHARD C. VISEK, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Hair, Christopher)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 26, 2021. (lcrbw1)
July 18, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/12/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/10/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY BLINKEN served on 7/12/2021; IAN G. BROWNLEE served on 7/12/2021; KATHLEEN FITZGIBBON served on 7/12/2021; MERRICK GARLAND served on 7/12/2021; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 7/6/2021; CLAIRE PIERANGELO served on 7/12/2021; TRACY RENAUD served on 7/6/2021; RICHARD C. VISEK served on 7/12/2021; CHRISTOPHER WRAY served on 7/12/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/12/2021. (Goldstein, Joshua)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to ANTONY BLINKEN, IAN G. BROWNLEE, KATHLEEN FITZGIBBON, MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, CLAIRE PIERANGELO, TRACY RENAUD, RICHARD C. VISEK, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8563984) filed by CHIOMA IRUKA IWUANYANWU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goldstein, Joshua)
June 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IWUANYANWU v. BLINKEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIOMA IRUKA IWUANYANWU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRICK GARLAND
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY RENAUD
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD C. VISEK
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAN G BROWNLEE
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN FITZGIBBON
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAIRE PIERANGELO
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?