HERNANDEZ MARTINEZ v. RUSSO et al
Petitioner: Rolando Enrique Hernandez Martinez
Respondent: MICHAEL RUSSO, JOHN TSOUKARIS, TAE D JOHNSON, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DAVID NEAL and MERRICK GARLAND
Case Number: 2:2021cv19347
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 11/15/2021. (bt, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rolando Enrique Hernandez Martinez (HUFSTADER, REBECCA)
October 28, 2021 Judge John Michael Vazquez added. (ps)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ANJDC-12930852.), filed by Rolando Enrique Hernandez Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit B - Custody Determination, #5 Exhibit C - DHS Evidence, #6 Exhibit D - Bond Motion, #7 Exhibit E - Notice of Bond Hearing, #8 Exhibit F - Bond Order, #9 Exhibit G - Bond Appeal, #10 Exhibit H - Bond Memo, #11 Exhibit I - BIA Extension Order, #12 Exhibit J - I-589, #13 Exhibit K - IJ Merits Decision, #14 Exhibit L - Certificate of Disposition, #15 Exhibit M - Pre-trial Release Order, #16 Exhibit N - Filing Receipt for BIA Appeal)(HUFSTADER, REBECCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ MARTINEZ v. RUSSO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rolando Enrique Hernandez Martinez
Represented By: REBECCA HUFSTADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL RUSSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TAE D JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MERRICK GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?