GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Defendant: EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION d/b/a THE SPINE AND SPORTS HEALTH CENTER, ALEXANDER VISCO, M.D., MICHAEL KELLY, D.C., RON BEN-MEIR, D.O., FERDINAND IANNACCONE, D.O., BASIL KURDALI, M.D., NEIL TROPIANO, D.C., PRISCILLA AMPONSAH, P.T., JOHN DE HOYOS, P.T., TORAL DOSHI, P.T., NIDHI MADHANI, P.T., ADITI MEHTA, P.T., JUAN C. NUNEZ, P.T., EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION doing business as THE SPINE AND SPORTS HEALTH CENTER, ALEXANDER VISCO, MICHAEL KELLY, RON BEN-MEIR, FERDINAND IANNACCONE, BASIL KURDALI, NEIL TROPIANO, PRISCILLA AMPONSAH, JOHN DE HOYOS, TORAL DOSHI, NIDHI MADHANI, ADITI MEHTA and JUAN C. NUNEZ
Cross Defendant: EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv19408
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to answer; that the Stipulating Defendants shall file and serve an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action on or before Monday, December 27, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/21/2021. (ld, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, to extend time to answer by PRISCILLA AMPONSAH, JOHN DE HOYOS, EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION, FERDINAND IANNACCONE, BASIL KURDALI, NIDHI MADHANI, ADITI MEHTA, JUAN C. NUNEZ, NEIL TROPIANO, ALEXANDER VISCO. (ROBERTS, KEITH)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROBERTS on behalf of PRISCILLA AMPONSAH, JOHN DE HOYOS, EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION, FERDINAND IANNACCONE, BASIL KURDALI, NIDHI MADHANI, ADITI MEHTA, JUAN C. NUNEZ, NEIL TROPIANO, ALEXANDER VISCO (ROBERTS, KEITH)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 2/1/2022 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/15/2021. (spc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTION AND INDEMNIFICATION against All Defendants by RON BEN-MEIR.(CONFORTI, DAMIAN)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Barry Levy, Max Gershenoff and Christina Bezas by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu Brief Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1(d)(4), #2 Certification of Gene Y. Kang, #3 Certification of Barry I. Levy, #4 Certification of Max Gershenoff, #5 Certification of Christina Bezas, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
December 7, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Barry Levy, Max Gershenoff and Christina Bezas. Motion set for 1/3/2022 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the time for Defendant Ron Ben-Meir, D.O., to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended to and including December 14, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/24/2021. (sm)
November 24, 2021 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #10 submitted by RON BEN-MEIR has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/14/2021. (sm)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time To Respond To Complaint by RON BEN-MEIR. (CONFORTI, DAMIAN)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED NABULSI on behalf of RON BEN-MEIR (NABULSI, MOHAMED)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW GIMIGLIANO on behalf of RON BEN-MEIR (GIMIGLIANO, ANDREW)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN P. CONFORTI on behalf of RON BEN-MEIR (CONFORTI, DAMIAN)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. RON BEN-MEIR served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. MICHAEL KELLY served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. FERDINAND IANNACCONE served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; ADITI MEHTA served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; NEIL TROPIANO served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Aditi Mehta, P.T., #2 Summons Returned Executed on Neil Tropiano, D.C., #3 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PRISCILLA AMPONSAH, RON BEN-MEIR, JOHN DE HOYOS, TORAL DOSHI, EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION, FERDINAND IANNACCONE, MICHAEL KELLY, BASIL KURDALI, NIDHI MADHANI, ADITI MEHTA, JUAN C. NUNEZ, NEIL TROPIANO, ALEXANDER VISCO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
October 29, 2021 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRISCILLA AMPONSAH, P.T., RON BEN-MEIR, D.O., JOHN DE HOYOS, P.T., TORAL DOSHI, P.T., EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION d/b/a THE SPINE AND SPORTS HEALTH CENTER, FERDINAND IANNACCONE, D.O., MICHAEL KELLY, D.C., BASIL KURDALI, M.D., NIDHI MADHANI, P.T., ADITI MEHTA, P.T., JUAN C. NUNEZ, P.T., NEIL TROPIANO, D.C., ALEXANDER VISCO, M.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12935307) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KANG, GENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION d/b/a THE SPINE AND SPORTS HEALTH CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER VISCO, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL KELLY, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON BEN-MEIR, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERDINAND IANNACCONE, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASIL KURDALI, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL TROPIANO, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRISCILLA AMPONSAH, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DE HOYOS, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORAL DOSHI, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIDHI MADHANI, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADITI MEHTA, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN C. NUNEZ, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION doing business as THE SPINE AND SPORTS HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER VISCO
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON BEN-MEIR
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERDINAND IANNACCONE
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASIL KURDALI
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL TROPIANO
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRISCILLA AMPONSAH
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DE HOYOS
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORAL DOSHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIDHI MADHANI
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADITI MEHTA
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN C. NUNEZ
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: EAST COAST SPINE, JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: KEITH J. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?