EPSTONE, INC. v. RAPHAEL STONE USA et al
Plaintiff: EPSTONE, INC. and ARTISTIC TILE, INC.
Defendant: RAPHAEL STONE USA and RAPHAEL STONE DESIGN, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv19857
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter; Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise reply is extended to 1/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/7/2022. (ams, )
January 7, 2022 Answer Due Deadline Update - The answer due date has been set for 1/13/2022. (ams, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by RAPHAEL STONE DESIGN, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MAZZEO, FRANK)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EPSTONE, INC., ARTISTIC TILE, INC.. RAPHAEL STONE USA served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (ROSS, MICHELE)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EPSTONE, INC., ARTISTIC TILE, INC.. RAPHAEL STONE DESIGN, LLC served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (ROSS, MICHELE)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RAPHAEL STONE DESIGN, LLC, RAPHAEL STONE USA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 AO121 Copyright Form filed. AO121 Copyright Form filed. Copyright Form Mailed to Register of Copyrights,U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibits A-I) (ld, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARTISTIC TILE, INC., EPSTONE, INC.. (ROSS, MICHELE)
November 10, 2021 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EPSTONE, INC., ARTISTIC TILE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-12967793) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EPSTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-I)(ROSS, MICHELE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EPSTONE, INC. v. RAPHAEL STONE USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPSTONE, INC.
Represented By: MICHELE L. ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTISTIC TILE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPHAEL STONE USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPHAEL STONE DESIGN, LLC
Represented By: FRANK A MAZZEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?