STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.160.55.28
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.160.55.28
Case Number: 2:2021cv19860
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Discovery etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/16/2021. (bt, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference Subject to a Protective Order by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of David Williamson, #3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of Susan Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(ATKIN, JOHN)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (bt, )
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Application for permission to file a Motion seeking leave to file a third party subpoena on Defendant's ISP prior to Rule 269(f) conference subject to a protective order. Plaintiff shall file aforementioned Motion within 10 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/12/2021. (bt, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION/PETITION for Leave to File a Discovery Motion for by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (ATKIN, JOHN)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ATKIN, JOHN)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.160.55.28 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12967980) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ATKIN, JOHN)
November 9, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.160.55.28
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOHN C. ATKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.160.55.28
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?