STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 100.1.114.33
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 100.1.114.33
Case Number: 2:2021cv19865
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE and ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL with prejudice, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/6/2022. (lag, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (ATKIN, JOHN)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/30/2021. (lag, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference Subject to a Protective Order by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of David Williamson, #3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of Susan Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(ATKIN, JOHN)
November 12, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference Subject to a Protective Order. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 100.1.114.33. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lag, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ATKIN, JOHN)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 100.1.114.33 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12968111) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ATKIN, JOHN)
November 9, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 100.1.114.33
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOHN C. ATKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 100.1.114.33
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?