ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. NJAI SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: NJAI SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv20053
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. NJAI SERVICES, LLC served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NJAI SERVICES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
November 18, 2021 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Aspen Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BARROW, TIMOTHY)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NJAI SERVICES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12987799), filed by ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BARROW, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. NJAI SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY DONALD BARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJAI SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?