CELGENE CORPORATION v. ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Defendant: ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ALEMBIC GLOBAL HOLDING SA and ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv20099
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CELGENE CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/24/2022. (wh)
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Global Holding SA, and Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims (D.I. 9).. (BATON, WILLIAM)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Request, extending the Deadline to file a Motion to Seal Defendants' Answer to Complaint and Counterclaims #9 & #11 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/4/2022. (wh)
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 Letter from Celgene to the Hon. Leda D. Wettre, U.S.M.J.. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 REDACTION to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by ALEMBIC GLOBAL HOLDING SA, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (Redacted), #5 Exhibit E (Redacted), #6 Exhibit F (Redacted), #7 Exhibit G (Redacted))(ABRAHAM, ERIC) Modified on 12/21/2021 (wh).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/21/21. (LM, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by ALEMBIC GLOBAL HOLDING SA, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Amendment to #9 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, Exhibit D. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALEMBIC GLOBAL HOLDING SA, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. identifying Alembic as Corporate Parent.. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CELGENE CORPORATION by ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ALEMBIC GLOBAL HOLDING SA, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(ABRAHAM, ERIC)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of ALEMBIC GLOBAL HOLDING SA, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALEMBIC GLOBAL HOLDING SA, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Exhibit E-G) (lag, )
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (BATON, WILLIAM)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (lag, )
November 19, 2021 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELGENE CORPORATION. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEMBIC GLOBAL HOLDING SA, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12991124) , Related Case Selected, filed by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Exhibits E-G, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CELGENE CORPORATION v. ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEMBIC GLOBAL HOLDING SA
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?