REICH v. COHEN et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN REICH
Defendant: MEIR SIMCHA COHEN, TELTECH SYSTEMS and SPOOFCARD LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv20227
Filed: November 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 3/15/2022. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 1/14/22. (gh, )
January 13, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement and Application for Adjournment by MEIR SIMCHA COHEN (KUPFER, DAVID)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Application; Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise reply is extended to 1/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/6/2022. (ams, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Angeline X. Chen. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/6/2022. (ams, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Rachel Thorn. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/6/2022. (ams, )
January 6, 2022 Answer Due Deadline Update - The answer due date has been set for 1/14/2022. (ams, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension Of Time To Answer, Move Or Otherwise Reply (L. R. Civ. P. 6.1) for by MEIR SIMCHA COHEN. (KUPFER, DAVID)
December 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Rachel Thorn, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Angeline X. Chen. Motion set for 1/3/2022 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Angeline X. Chen by MEIR SIMCHA COHEN. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration of David Kupfer in Support, #3 Declaration of Angeline X. Chen in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KUPFER, DAVID)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Rachel Thorn by MEIR SIMCHA COHEN. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration of David Kupfer in Support, #3 Declaration of Rachel Thorn in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KUPFER, DAVID)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the application of Defendant Meir Simcha Cohen for an extension of time to file an answer, move or otherwise reply until 1/7/22. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 12/6/21. (gh, )
December 3, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Attempted Service by MEIR SIMCHA COHEN. (KUPFER, DAVID)
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by SPOOFCARD LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (KWELTY, CHRISTOPHER)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Service by MEIR SIMCHA COHEN. (KUPFER, DAVID)
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by TELTECH SYSTEMS Consent to Removal (GALLO, CHRISTINA)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER SEAN KWELTY on behalf of SPOOFCARD LLC (KWELTY, CHRISTOPHER)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (KUPFER, DAVID)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA GALLO on behalf of TELTECH SYSTEMS (GALLO, CHRISTINA)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL DAVID MARGULIES on behalf of TELTECH SYSTEMS (MARGULIES, MICHAEL)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID H. KUPFER on behalf of MEIR SIMCHA COHEN (KUPFER, DAVID)
November 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, )
November 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MEIR SIMCHA COHEN from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-006310-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13004461), filed by MEIR SIMCHA COHEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KUPFER, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REICH v. COHEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN REICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEIR SIMCHA COHEN
Represented By: DAVID H. KUPFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELTECH SYSTEMS
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID MARGULIES
Represented By: CHRISTINA GALLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPOOFCARD LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER SEAN KWELTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?