C & M MINI MARKET v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: C & M MINI MARKET
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2021cv20246
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 Letter from the Government advising the Court that the parties have resolved this case in principle. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on February 10, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/27/2021. (sms)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER to temporary stay of USDA's decision, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/27/2021. (lag, )
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER terminating #6 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Stay Final Agency Decision, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/27/2021. (lag, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Agreeing to Temporary Stay of USDA Decision by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from the Government advising the Court that it has agreed to a temporary stay of USDA's decision. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (VASSALLO, KRISTIN)
December 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Jeremy M. Feigenbaum $300, receipt number TRE123574 (jal)
December 8, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 12/8/2021. (jl, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant on 12/6/2021, filed by C & M MINI MARKET. (SAROFIEM, MEKHAIL)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Stay Final Agency Decision by C & M MINI MARKET. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Points, Law and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Ex. A -Final Agency Decision, #3 Exhibit Ex. B-Declaration of Mohammed Akl, #4 Exhibit Ex. C-C&M Market Revenue 2H21, #5 Exhibit Ex. D-Exhibits to Charge Letter, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SAROFIEM, MEKHAIL)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the #3 application for the pro hac vice admission of Jeremy G. Feigenbaum. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/6/2021. (qa, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
December 1, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy G. Feigenbaum, Esq.. Motion set for 1/3/2022 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
November 30, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy G. Feigenbaum, Esq. by C & M MINI MARKET. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ex. A Declaration of Jeremy Feigenbaum, Esq.)(SAROFIEM, MEKHAIL)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by C & M MINI MARKET. (SAROFIEM, MEKHAIL)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13008236) with JURY DEMAND, filed by C & M MINI MARKET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Final Agency Decision)(SAROFIEM, MEKHAIL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C & M MINI MARKET v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C & M MINI MARKET
Represented By: MEKHAIL EMIL SAROFIEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?