BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY v. EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALTIES, LTD.
Plaintiff: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Defendant: EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALTIES, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2021cv20409
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation & Order of Dismissal) (wh)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims, counterclaims, and defenses asserted by any of the undersigned parties against any other undersigned party in the above matter are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. This Court retains jurisdiction to enforce this Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/7/2022. (wh)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Kevin McNulty, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal)(WALSH, LIZA)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALTIES, LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (wh)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (WALSH, WILLIAM)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
December 10, 2021 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALTIES, LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13030943) , Related Case Selected, filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 AO120 Patent Form)(WALSH, LIZA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY v. EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALTIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALTIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?