CELGENE CORPORATION v. HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Defendant: HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv20459
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/CONSENT JUDGMENT; Until expiration of the Patents-in-Suit, Hikma, including any of its successors and assigns, is enjoined from infringing the Patents-in-Suit, on its own part or through any third party on its behalf, by making, having made, using, selling, offering to sell, importing, or distributing of the Hikma ANDA Product in or for the United States of America, including its territories, possessions, and the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, unless and to the extent otherwise specifically authorized by Celgene; All claims, counterclaims, affirmative defenses, and demands in these actions that relate to Hikma are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs, disbursements, or attorneys' fees to any party;etc.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/13/2022. (ld, )
January 13, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Celgene to Judge Wigenton, U.S.D.J. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
December 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (BATON, WILLIAM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibits) (wh)
December 13, 2021 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELGENE CORPORATION. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13036860) , Related Case Selected, filed by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CELGENE CORPORATION v. HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?