ENERGETIX CORPORATION v. ENERGENX LLC
Plaintiff: ENERGETIX CORPORATION
Defendant: ENERGENX LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv20518
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ENERGETIX CORPORATION (FELLNER, GARY)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ENERGENX LLC. ENERGENX LLC waiver sent on 12/16/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. (ADAMS, MATTHEW)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW STEPHEN ADAMS on behalf of ENERGENX LLC (ADAMS, MATTHEW)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ENERGENX LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (ams, )
December 16, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENERGETIX CORPORATION. (FELLNER, GARY)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENERGENX LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13045715) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ENERGETIX CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(FELLNER, GARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENERGETIX CORPORATION v. ENERGENX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENERGETIX CORPORATION
Represented By: GARY M. FELLNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENERGENX LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW STEPHEN ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?