SANCHEZ v. ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: DOMINGO SANCHEZ
Defendant: ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv20626
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/17/2022. (sms)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 Joint Discovery Plan by ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCLAUGHLIN, MICHAEL)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCLAUGHLIN, MICHAEL)
January 5, 2022 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on February 17, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/27/2021. (sms)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the #4 6.1 Application for an extension of time to answer, move or otherwise reply until January 11, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/22/2021. (qa, )
December 22, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/11/2022. (qa, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney MICHAEL J. MCLAUGHLIN for ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY added. (MCLAUGHLIN, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney MICHAEL J. MCLAUGHLIN for ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY added. (MCLAUGHLIN, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying St. Paul Protective Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (MCLAUGHLIN, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY from New Jersey Superior Court, case number UNNL 397021. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13059048), filed by ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCLAUGHLIN, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
December 21, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANCHEZ v. ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINGO SANCHEZ
Represented By: DANIEL W. BALLARD, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. MCLAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?