SIMPSON v. TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC et al
Plaintiff: GLENDA SIMPSON
Defendant: TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC and JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC
In Re: ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv20719
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLENDA SIMPSON. ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (HERRING, NINA) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/27/2022) (wh, ).
January 25, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLENDA SIMPSON. JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (HERRING, NINA) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/27/2022) (wh, ).
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLENDA SIMPSON. TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (HERRING, NINA)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLENDA SIMPSON. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (HERRING, NINA)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS GENE MCINTOSH on behalf of TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC (MCINTOSH, THOMAS)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, )
December 28, 2021 This case is part of MDL2973. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found #Here (gh, )
December 28, 2021 Member Case Direct File on 12/27/21, for MDL 2973 ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, )
December 27, 2021 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (gh, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13069591) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GLENDA SIMPSON. (Attachments: #1 Designation Forum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(HERRING, NINA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMPSON v. TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENDA SIMPSON
Represented By: NINA TOWLE HERRING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC
Represented By: THOMAS GENE MCINTOSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?