ROSE v. FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ROSE, SIXTYSIX CAPITAL, LLC, VAN CARLUCCI and ART BARTOSIK
Defendant: FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., FERRARI N.V., FERRARI S.P.A., ROBERT BOSCH, LLC and ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Case Number: 2:2021cv20772
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael E Farbiarz
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
2 Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 10/17/23 at 11:30am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/22/23. (tjg, )
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Zoom Status Conference held on 5/22/2023. (tjg, )
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION to Seal by ROBERT BOSCH GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Thomas Regan, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Appendix U, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(DEENEY, BRIAN)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #103 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 6/20/2023 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/18/2023. (mmb, )
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #100 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #100 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James E. Cecchi)(CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by ROBERT BOSCH GMBH. Responses due by 5/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration James Cecchi with Exhibits A-E, #4 Exhibit G-Q of Cecchi Declaration, #5 Brief in Further Support, #6 Certificate of Service)(DEENEY, BRIAN)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #94 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #99 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/15/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., FERRARI S.P.A.. Responses due by 4/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Certification in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion, #4 Brief in Opposition, #5 Brief in Further Support)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 DECLARATION of Enrico Gallieri in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re #94 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FERRARI S.P.A.. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Certification of James E. Cecchi in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Part 3 of 3) on behalf of FERRARI S.P.A. Re #94 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Certification of James E. Cecchi in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Part 2 of 3) on behalf of FERRARI S.P.A. Re #94 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Certification of James E. Cecchi in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Part 1 of 3) on behalf of FERRARI S.P.A. Re #94 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FERRARI S.P.A.. Responses due by 4/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion, #3 Brief in Opposition, #4 Brief in Further Support)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint by FERRARI S.P.A.. Responses due by 4/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TEXT ORDER: In light of Plaintiff Bartosik's notice of voluntary dismissal, (ECF No. 91), the Court will once again conduct the 5/22/23 status conference via Zoom, and will distribute connection information on the day of the session. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/3/23. (tjd)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE by ART BARTOSIK, SIXTYSIX CAPITAL, LLC OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed counsel's letter dated 3/28/23. (ECF No. 89). The Court will conduct the conference already scheduled for 5/22/23 IN PERSON in Courtroom 4D of the Martin Luther King Building and U.S. Courthouse, 50 Walnut Street, Newark, New Jersey. Plaintiff Bartosik must attend. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/31/23. (tjd)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Letter from Christopher Dalton. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Voluntary Dismissal of Robert Bosch, LLC Without Prejudice (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 3/9/2023. (tjg, )
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER that Bosch LLC will serve but not file its renewed Rule 12 motion on or before 3/3/2023. Robert Bosch GmbH will serve but not file its Rule 12 motion in response to the Amended Complaint on or before 3/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/24/2023. (dam)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION Regarding Deadlines for Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch GmbH to Respond to Amended Complaint by ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, ROBERT BOSCH, LLC. (REGAN, THOMAS)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TEXT ORDER: The Court will continue the 1/26/23 zoom status conference on 5/22/23 at 11:30am. So Ordered by U.S.M.J. Cathy L. Waldor. (tjg, )
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 1/26/2023. (tjg, )
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TEXT ORDER: TEXT ORDER: The Court will reschedule the 2/22/23 conference to 3/9/23 at 12:30pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/11/23. (tjg, )
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEXT ORDER: The Court will reschedule the 2/22/23 conference to 2/28/23 at 2pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/11/23. (tjg, )
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 12/22/2022. (tjg, )
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION and ORDER extending the deadline for Defendants ROBERT BOSCH, LLC and ROBERT BOSCH GMBH to respond to the Amended Complaint through 2/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/19/2022. (dam)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION Regarding Deadlines for Robert Bosch, LLC and Robert Bosch GmbH to Respond to Amended Complaint by ROBERT BOSCH GMBH. (REGAN, THOMAS)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIXTYSIX CAPITAL, LLC. (CECCHI, JAMES)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., FERRARI S.P.A., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, ROBERT BOSCH, LLC, SIXTYSIX CAPITAL, LLC, VAN CARLUCCI, ART BARTOSIK, filed by JEFFREY ROSE, SIXTYSIX CAPITAL, LLC, VAN CARLUCCI, ART BARTOSIK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT ORDER: In light of the recent developments in this matter, the telephone conference scheduled for 11/30/22 is CANCELLED. The next event in this matter will be the Zoom conference scheduled for 12/22/22. (ECF No. 71). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/29/22. (tjd)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Jurisdictional Discovery Requests through and until 12/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/23/2022. (wh)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Jurisdictional Discovery Requests by ROBERT BOSCH, LLC. (REGAN, THOMAS)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Plaintiff's Time to File the Amended Complaint and Ferrari Defendants' Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule in Event of Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff will file his Amended Complaint on or before 12/5/2022. Ferrari Defendants will respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 1/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/18/2022. (dam)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Letter re #73 Stipulation and Order,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule. The Ferrari Defendants' time to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended through and until 12/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/14/2022. (dam)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION re #68 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, Extending Ferrari Defendants' Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., FERRARI S.P.A.. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct Zoom status conferences on 12/22/22, 1/26/23, and 2/22/23. Each conference will begin at 1:00 p.m. and the Court will distribute connection information to counsel of record on the day of each conference. The parties shall promptly advise the Court of any discovery or case management issues that arise in the interim. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/4/22. (tjd)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Zoom Status Conference held on 11/4/2022. (tjg, )
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER: The Court will reschedule the 11/4/22 conference to 11am. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/3/22. (tjg, )
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ORDER: The undersigned has reviewed Judge Vazquez's 10/25/22 Order, (ECF No. 68), and will conduct a status conference, via Zoom, on 11/4/22 at 10:00 a.m. The Court will distribute connection information to counsel of record on the day of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/25/22. (tjd)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot #50 , #51 Defendants' Motions to Stay; denying without prejudice as moot #61 Defendant Bosch's Motion for Protective Order; granting #22 Defendant Ferrari North America Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss; denying #25 Defendant Bosch's Motion to Dismiss; dismissing the Complaint as to Ferrari without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Pleading that remedies the identified deficiencies as to Ferrari. Defendant Bosch is given leave to file a renewed Motion to Dismiss after the completion of jurisdictional discovery. The renewed motion must be filed within four (4) months from the date of the Order. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/25/2022. (dam)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/25/2022. (dam)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #61 MOTION for Protective Order (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #61 MOTION for Protective Order. Motion reset for 11/7/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER ORDER granting #63 Plaintiff's Letter requesting to modify the deadlines and Motion Day regarding the #61 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/3/2022. (dam)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant FERRARI S.P.A.'s time to respond to the Complaint through and until 11/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/30/2022. (dam)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Letter from Caroline F. Bartlett, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor Regarding an Extension of Time re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #61 MOTION for Protective Order . (BARTLETT, CAROLINE)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Ferrari SPA's Time to Respond by FERRARI S.P.A.. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Protective Order by ROBERT BOSCH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification Thomas Regan, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(DEENEY, BRIAN)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #61 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 10/17/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 11/30/22 at 10:30am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/29/22. (tjg, )
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 8/23/2022. (tjg, )
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that James E. Cecchi of Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C ("Carella Byrne"); Michael J. Flannery of Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP ("CGL"); and Gary K. Burger of Burger Law, LLC ("Burger Law") are hereby appointed as Interim Class Counsel on behalf of the Plaintiff and the proposed class. James E. Cecchi is also hereby appointed as Interim Liaison Counsel for Plaintiff and the proposed class.. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/19/2022. (ld, )
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE re #55 Notice (Other),. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BAYLY, MELISSA)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. John M. Vazquez, U.S.D.J. regarding Appointment of Proposed Interim Class Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT ORDER: The Court will reschedule the 8/18/22 conference to 8/23/22 at 10:30am. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/10/22. (tjg, )
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #50 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order , #51 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order , #25 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #50 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order , #51 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ROBERT BOSCH, LLC re #25 MOTION to Dismiss (DEENEY, BRIAN)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC. re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #50 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order , #51 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order . Motion set for 6/21/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order by ROBERT BOSCH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification Thomas Regan, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(DEENEY, BRIAN)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN M. THOMAS, ERIC C. TEW and KRISTA L. LENART, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John Thomas to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DEENEY, BRIAN)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric Tew to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DEENEY, BRIAN)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Krista Lenart to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DEENEY, BRIAN)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee for Kathy A. Wisiewski and Stephen D'Aunoy: $ 300, receipt number NEW046610 (jr)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO STAY DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/3/2022. (sm)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER re: #42 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/3/2022. (sm)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Krista L. Lenart, John M. Thomas, and Eric C. Tew: $ 450, receipt number TRE126258 (jdg)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #22 MOTION to Dismiss , #25 MOTION to Dismiss (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION re 41 Order, Briefing Schedule on Motions to Stay Discovery by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION TO APPOINT A SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #42 MOTION TO APPOINT A SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER: Parties will submit a briefing schedule addressing the motion for a stay. Parties shall meet and confer and discuss what if any jurisdictional discovery is necessary and inform the Court on the docket of same, with a schedule for that proposed discovery. The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 8/18/22 at 11:30am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/26/22. (tjg, )
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/25/2022. (tjg, )
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct the telephone conference already scheduled for 4/25/22 via its dedicated conference line. The parties are instructed to dial 1-888-808-6929 and enter Access Code 9464201 at the time of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/21/2022. (tjd)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(BARTLETT, CAROLINE)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jordan M. Steele to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13300438.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dylan T. Martin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13300412.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James Mitchell Williams to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13300389.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice H. Clay Barnett, III to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13300375.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13300343.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER PERMITTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF W. DANIEL DEE MILES, III, H. CLAY BARNETT, III, JAMES MITCHELL WILLIAMS, DYLAN T. MARTIN, AND JORDAN M. STEELE; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/28/2022. (sm)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER PERMITTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KRISTA L. LENART, JOHN M. THOMAS, AND ERIC C. TEW; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/28/2022. (sm)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 4/25/22 at 10:30am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/28/22. (tjg, )
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James E. Cecchi, #2 Certification of Clay Barnett, III, #3 Certification of James E. Cecchi, #4 Certification of W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III, #5 Certification of James E. Cecchi, #6 Certification of Dylan T. Martin, #7 Certification of James E. Cecchi, #8 Certification of James Mitchell Williams, #9 Certification of James E. Cecchi, #10 Certification Jordan M. Steele, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ROBERT BOSCH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Krista L. Lenart, #2 Certification Certification of John M. Thomas, #3 Certification Certification of Eric C. Tew, #4 Declaration Declaration on behalf of Krista L. Lenart, #5 Declaration Declaration on behalf of John M. Thomas, #6 Declaration Declaration on behalf of Eric C. Tew, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for PHV Admission)(KAMARIS, KARLEY)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kathy Wisniewski to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WEYAND, JACQUELINE)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephen D'Aunoy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WEYAND, JACQUELINE)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss , #25 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/18/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KATHY A. WISNIEWSKI AND STEPHEN D'AUNOY; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/14/2022. (sm)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by ROBERT BOSCH, LLC. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(KAMARIS, KARLEY)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC. re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC. re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC.. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC. identifying Defendant Ferrari North America, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Ferrari S.p.A., which in turn is wholly owned by Ferrari N.V., which is a publicly-traded company. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter from Christopher J. Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of C. Dalton in Support of Application for pro hac vice admission of Kathy A. Wisniewski, #2 Exhibit Certification of C. Dalton in Support of Application for pro hac vice admission of Stephen A. DAunoy, #3 Exhibit Certification of K. Wisniewski, #4 Exhibit Certification of D. DAunoy, #5 Exhibit Proposed Order)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gary K. Burger to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13224390.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alexandra C. Warren to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13224383.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Flannery to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13224377.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Charles J. LaDuca to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13224354.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by KARLEY E. KAMARIS on behalf of ROBERT BOSCH, LLC (KAMARIS, KARLEY)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER PERMITTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHARLES J. LADUCA, MICHAEL J. FLANNERY,ALEXANDRA C. WARREN, AND GARY K. BURGER; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/18/2022. (sm)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James E. Cecchi in Support of Application for pro hac vice Admission of Gary K. Burger, #2 Certification of James E. Cecchi in Support of Application for pro hac vice Admission of Charles J. LaDuca, #3 Certification of James E. Cecchi in Support of Application for pro hac vice Admission of Michael J. Flannery, #4 Certification of James E. Cecchi in Support of Application for pro hac vice Admission of Alexandra C. Warren, #5 Certification of Gary K. Burger, #6 Certification of Charles J. LaDuca, #7 Certification of Michael J. Flannery, #8 Certification of Alexandra C. Warren, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/14/2022. (sm)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, and Proposed Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss by FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #8 submitted by ROBERT BOSCH, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/28/2022. (sm)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT that the time for Defendant Robert Bosch LLC to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 2/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/31/2022. (sm)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROBERT BOSCH, LLC identifying Robert Bosch GmbH as Corporate Parent.. (DEENEY, BRIAN)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by ROBERT BOSCH, LLC. (DEENEY, BRIAN)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN DEENEY on behalf of ROBERT BOSCH, LLC (DEENEY, BRIAN)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ferrari North America, Inc.. Attorney CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON,JACQUELINE M. WEYAND,MELISSA JEAN BAYLY for FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC. added. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFFREY ROSE. ROBERT BOSCH, LLC served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFFREY ROSE. FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC. served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE F. BARTLETT on behalf of JEFFREY ROSE (BARTLETT, CAROLINE)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FERRARI N.V., FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., FERRARI S.P.A., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, ROBERT BOSCH, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FERRARI N.V., FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC., FERRARI S.P.A., ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, ROBERT BOSCH, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13075851) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JEFFREY ROSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSE v. FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ROSE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIXTYSIX CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VAN CARLUCCI
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ART BARTOSIK
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON
Represented By: JACQUELINE M. WEYAND
Represented By: MELISSA JEAN BAYLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERRARI N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERRARI S.P.A.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BOSCH, LLC
Represented By: BRIAN DEENEY
Represented By: KARLEY E. KAMARIS
Represented By: THOMAS C. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Represented By: BRIAN DEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?