DEBOSE v. DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC
Plaintiff: RASHAD DEBOSE
Defendant: DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC and DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00209
Filed: January 17, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to the case. (sbg, )
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of RAINA C.BORRELLI. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/28/2022. (wh)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The time in which DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC. has to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be and hereby is extended up to and including 3/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/28/2022. (wh)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Update - The #6 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond submitted by DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC. has been GRANTED per #7 Stipulation and Consent Order. The answer due date has been reset for 3/30/2022. (wh)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC.. (O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been reset for 2/28/2022. (wh)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Dun & Bradstreet Holdings, Inc.. Attorney MICHAEL R. O'DONNELL for DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC. added. (O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Raina C. Borrelli, Esq.. Motion set for 3/7/2022 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Raina C. Borrelli, Esq. by RASHAD DEBOSE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James A. Barry, Esq., #2 Certification of Raina C. Borrelli, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BARRY, JAMES)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RASHAD DEBOSE. DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC. served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. (BARRY, JAMES)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13115581) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RASHAD DEBOSE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(BARRY, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEBOSE v. DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASHAD DEBOSE
Represented By: JAMES A. BARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUN & BRADSTREET HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL R. O'DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?