FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Plaintiff: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.AS SUBROGEE OF JUAN BATISTA AND JACQUELINE BATISTA and FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., d/b/a FRIGIDAIRE and ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. doing business as FRIGIDAIRE
Case Number: 2:2022cv00663
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER: Counsel is directed to move this civil action by requesting the entry of default as to Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and by filing a motion for default judgment within thirty (30) days from the date hereof. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/4/2022. (ams, )
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard A. Schuster, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/8/2022. (ams, )
February 21, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Stmt served on Electrolux Home Products on February 17, 2022, filed by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 17, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/21/2022 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Richard A Schuster, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 9, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.AS SUBROGEE OF JUAN BATISTA AND JACQUELINE BATISTA identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.AS SUBROGEE OF JUAN BATISTA AND JACQUELINE BATISTA. (GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., d/b/a FRIGIDAIRE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13173224), filed by FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.AS SUBROGEE OF JUAN BATISTA AND JACQUELINE BATISTA.(GRADOFSKY, NOAH)
February 8, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)
February 8, 2022 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC. v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.AS SUBROGEE OF JUAN BATISTA AND JACQUELINE BATISTA
Represented By: NOAH COLIN GRADOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS, INC.
Represented By: NOAH COLIN GRADOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., d/b/a FRIGIDAIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. doing business as FRIGIDAIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?