SCANNING TECHNOLOGIES INNOVATIONS LLC v. PEGASUS U.S.A. LLC
Plaintiff: SCANNING TECHNOLOGIES INNOVATIONS LLC
Defendant: PEGASUS U.S.A. LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01157
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PEGASUS U.S.A. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, )
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by SCANNING TECHNOLOGIES INNOVATIONS LLC as to PEGASUS U.S.A. LLC. (KRIEGEL, MARK)
March 15, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCANNING TECHNOLOGIES INNOVATIONS LLC identifying Patent Asset Management as Corporate Parent.. (KRIEGEL, MARK)
March 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PEGASUS U.S.A. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13226992) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SCANNING TECHNOLOGIES INNOVATIONS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KRIEGEL, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCANNING TECHNOLOGIES INNOVATIONS LLC v. PEGASUS U.S.A. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCANNING TECHNOLOGIES INNOVATIONS LLC
Represented By: MARK AARON KRIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEGASUS U.S.A. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?