CENTER FOR MINDFUL CHANGE, LLC v. DAVIS et al
Plaintiff: Center for Mindful Change, LLC
Defendant: Christopher Davis, Jessica Kutz Flores and MINDIVE, GPA
Case Number: 2:2022cv01945
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER extending defendants' time to answer complaint through 6/10/2022, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/3/2022. (lag, )
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR MINDFUL CHANGE, LLC. All Defendants. (GATTONI, MICHAEL)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 Letter from Counsel for Defendants re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 AO120 Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lag, )
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRISTOPHER DAVIS, JESSICA KUTZ FLORES, MINDIVE, GPA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Theresa L. Burnett on 04/08/2022. (man)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 Application for Refund of Fees (finance notified).. (GATTONI, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
April 6, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13313293), filed by Center for Mindful Change, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(GATTONI, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR MINDFUL CHANGE, LLC v. DAVIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Mindful Change, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL VINCENT GATTONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Kutz Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINDIVE, GPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?