STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 104.148.180.89
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 104.148.180.89
Case Number: 2:2022cv01952
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: William J Martini
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE that Plaintiffs motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena on Defendants ISP, (ECF No. 6), is GRANTED IN PART; that Plaintiff may serve Optimum Online with a subpoena pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with only the name and address of the subscriber associated with IP address 104.148.180.89 at the time at issue in the Complaint; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/26/2022. (sm)
April 25, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference Subject to a Protective Order. Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
April 22, 2022 Filing 6 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference Subject to a Protective Order by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of David Williamson, #3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of Susan Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(ATKIN, JOHN)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's request for leave to file a discovery motion, (ECF No. 4), is GRANTED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/8/2022. (tjd)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION/PETITION for Leave to File a Discovery Motion for by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (ATKIN, JOHN)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (sm)
April 6, 2022 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ATKIN, JOHN)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 104.148.180.89 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13313304) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ATKIN, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 104.148.180.89
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOHN C. ATKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 104.148.180.89
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?