CELGENE CORPORATION v. MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Defendant: MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED and MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01993
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Scheduling Conference on 6/16/2022 is adjourned to 6/28/2022 at 12:30 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 6/23/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/5/2022. (bt)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2022 at 3:30 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 6/15/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/4/2022. (jqb, )
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2022 at 3:30 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 7/15/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/3/2022. (jqb, )
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER that MSN shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 6/13/2022. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/3/2022. (ams, )
May 3, 2022 Answer Due Deadline Update - The answer due date has been set for 6/13/2022. (ams, )
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 Letter from Celgene to the Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CELGENE CORPORATION. MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 4/12/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: On or before 4/18/2022, Plaintiff's counsel shall mail a courtesy copy of the complaint to Chambers. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/11/2022. (jqb, )
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (BATON, WILLIAM)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (ams, )
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
April 7, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELGENE CORPORATION. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13316666) , Related Case Selected, filed by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CELGENE CORPORATION v. MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?