WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC v. BOROUGH OF WOOD-RIDGE et al
Plaintiff: WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC
Defendant: BOROUGH OF WOOD-RIDGE, BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WOOD-RIDGE, NEGLIA ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, MICHAEL NEGLIA and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv02009
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against the Borough of Wood-Ridge and Borough Council of Wood-Ridge (GLEASON, DENNIS)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 6/21/2022 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WOOD-RIDGE, BOROUGH OF WOOD-RIDGE. Responses due by 5/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Eilert, #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Order (proposed), #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Brief in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction, #6 Certification of Christopher Eilert, #7 Certification of Service (opposition))(SALERNO, GERALD) Modified on 5/17/2022 (wh). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/17/2022) (gh).
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Neglia's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MICHAEL NEGLIA, NEGLIA ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES.(ADELSOHN, LISA)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WOOD-RIDGE, BOROUGH OF WOOD-RIDGE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/16/2022. (wh)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter from Dennis F. Gleason to Hon. William Martini. (GLEASON, DENNIS)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Borough of Wood-Ridge and Borough Counsel of Wood-Ridge.. (SALERNO, GERALD)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NEGLIA ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, MICHAEL NEGLIA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/16/2022. (wh)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA O ADELSOHN on behalf of MICHAEL NEGLIA, NEGLIA ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES (ADELSOHN, LISA)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Neglia Engineering Associates and Michael Neglia.. (ADELSOHN, LISA)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #5 , #6 , #7 , and #8 Summons Returned Executed filed by D. GLEASON on 4/18/2022 were submitted incorrectly as a Affidavits of Service. For future reference, if filing a Return of Service or Affidavit of Service indicating the date of service of the Summons and the Complaint, please refer to the event "Summons Returned Executed" (or "Summons Returned Executed as to USA", when applicable). (wh)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Neglia Engineering Associates on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022, filed by WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC. (GLEASON, DENNIS) Modified on 4/19/2022 (wh).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Michael Neglia on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022, filed by WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC. (GLEASON, DENNIS) Modified on 4/19/2022 (wh).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Council Borough of Wood-Ridge on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022, filed by WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC. (GLEASON, DENNIS) Modified on 4/19/2022 (wh).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Borough of Wood-Ridge on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022, filed by WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC. (GLEASON, DENNIS) Modified on 4/19/2022 (wh).
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against the Borough of Wood-Ridge and Borough Council of Wood-Ridge. Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against the Borough of Wood-Ridge and Borough Council of Wood-Ridge by WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Richard Wedemeyer, #3 Declaration Steven Schepis, w Exhibits A through D, #4 Exhibit E through M to Schepis Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GLEASON, DENNIS)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC identifying no Corporate Parent. (GLEASON, DENNIS) Modified on 4/8/2022 (wh).
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WOOD-RIDGE, BOROUGH OF WOOD-RIDGE, MICHAEL NEGLIA, NEGLIA ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13318594) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Willow Street Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GLEASON, DENNIS)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC v. BOROUGH OF WOOD-RIDGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLOW STREET PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By: DENNIS FRANCIS GLEASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF WOOD-RIDGE
Represented By: GERALD R. SALERNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH COUNCIL OF WOOD-RIDGE
Represented By: GERALD R. SALERNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEGLIA ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES
Represented By: LISA O ADELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL NEGLIA
Represented By: LISA O ADELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?