PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. et al v. CIPLA LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC and ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC
Defendant: CIPLA USA, INC.
Counter Claimant: CIPLA LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2022cv02814
Filed: May 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: James B Clark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, without prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/26/2023. (jd, )
September 22, 2023 Filing 49 Letter from Brian M. Goldberg to Judge Arleo regarding stipulation of dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
September 13, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 9/13/2023. (seb)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 LETTER ORDER granting #47 Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to submit its reply brief, until 9/21/2023. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/11/2023. (jd, )
September 7, 2023 Filing 47 Letter from Brian M. Goldberg to Judge Arleo regarding reply brief extension. (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
September 5, 2023 Filing 46 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC. re #43 MOTION to Strike #38 Markman Response Brief reliance on Declaration of Dr. Yaman (Opposition to Motion to Strike) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Coyle, #2 Exhibit 1 to Coyle Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Coyle Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Coyle Decl.)(CONROY, REBEKAH)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #40 Joint Motion to Seal portions of the parties' Markman Briefs and supporting documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/30/2023. (jd, )
August 22, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #43 MOTION to Strike #38 Markman Response Brief reliance on Declaration of Dr. Yaman. Motion set for 9/18/2023 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
August 22, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #40 Joint MOTION to Seal Claim Construction Materials. Motion set for 9/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
August 21, 2023 Filing 44 STATEMENT L. PAT. R. 4.6 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
August 21, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION to Strike #38 Markman Response Brief reliance on Declaration of Dr. Yaman by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. Responses due by 9/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Plaintiffs' motion to strike, #2 Declaration of Brian M. Goldberg, #3 Exhibit 1 to Goldberg Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Goldberg Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Goldberg Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
August 21, 2023 Filing 42 REDACTION to #37 Exhibit (to Document),, by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
August 21, 2023 Filing 41 REDACTION to #28 Markman Opening Brief,,, by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Zlatan Coralic (Public), #2 Declaration of Dr. Lee Kirsch (Public), #3 Declaration of Brian M. Goldberg (Public), #4 Exhibit 1 to Goldberg Declaration (Public), #5 Exhibit 2 to Goldberg Declaration (Public), #6 Exhibit 3 to Goldberg Declaration (Public), #7 Exhibit 4 to Goldberg Declaration (Public), #8 Exhibit 5 to Goldberg Declaration (Public), #9 Exhibit 6 to Goldberg Declaration (Public), #10 Exhibit 7 to Goldberg Declaration (Public), #11 Exhibit 8 to Goldberg Declaration (Public), #12 Exhibit 9-21 to Goldberg Declaration (Public))(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
August 21, 2023 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Seal Claim Construction Materials by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement in lieu of brief, #2 Declaration of Brian M. Goldberg, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Goldberg Declaration, #4 Declaration of Rebekah R. Conroy, #5 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
August 7, 2023 Filing 39 Exhibit to #38 Markman Response Brief (Exhibit 1 to Geiger Decl.) by CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Geiger Decl.)(CONROY, REBEKAH)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 7, 2023 Filing 38 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #28 Markman Opening Brief,,, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alpaslan Yaman, Ph.D., #2 Declaration of Nicholas A. Geiger, Esq.)(CONROY, REBEKAH)
August 7, 2023 Filing 37 Exhibit to #36 Markman Response Brief Confidential Exhibit 22 by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 7, 2023 Filing 36 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #29 Markman Opening Brief, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian M. Goldberg, #2 Exhibit 23)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
July 24, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 7/24/2023. (seb)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference with the parties on 9/13/2023 at 11:00 AM. Counsel for Defendants shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/24/2023. (wh)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CONSENT ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/8/2023. (jd, )
June 5, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2023. (seb)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER ORDER Scheduling a Telephone Status Conference set for 7/24/2023 at 11:30 AM; Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/5/2023. (jd, ) (Main Document 33 replaced on 6/5/2023) (jd, ).
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER ORDER re #31 Advising the Initial Conference scheduled in Civil Action No. 23-1150 for 5/25/2023 at 10:30 AM is adjourned. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/11/2023. (jd, )
May 11, 2023 Filing 31 Letter from Brian M. Goldberg to Judge Clark regarding initial scheduling conference. (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT ORDER Consolidating Cases and Amending Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/26/2023. (jd, )
April 27, 2023 Filing 29 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Coyle, #2 Exhibit A to Coyle Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Coyle Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Coyle Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Coyle Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Coyle Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Coyle Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Coyle Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Coyle Decl., #10 Exhibit I to Coyle Decl., #11 Exhibit J to Coyle Decl.)(CONROY, REBEKAH)
April 27, 2023 Filing 28 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF of Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Zlatan Coralic, #2 Declaration of Dr. Lee E. Kirsch, #3 Declaration of Brian M. Goldberg, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9-21)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 4, 2023 Filing 27 Letter from Brian M. Goldberg to Judge Clark regarding consolidation consent order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Order Consolidating Cases)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
March 13, 2023 Filing 26 STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Parties Proposed Constructions and Supporting Evidence)(CONROY, REBEKAH)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER ORDER Scheduling a Telephone Status Conference on 6/5/2023 at 11:30 AM; Counsel for Defendants shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/14/2023. (jd, )
February 14, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 2/14/2023. (seb)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER ORDER Adjourning the Telephone Conference to 2/14/2023 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/2/2023. (jd, )
December 21, 2022 Pro Hac Vice fee: $450.00, receipt number NEW47602 as to Jonathan D.J. Loeb, Luke M. Reilly & Daniel R. Roberts. (ps)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Application for the pro hac vice admission of Counsel JONATHAN D.J. LOEB, LUKE M. REILLY, AND DANIEL R. ROBERTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/15/2022. (jd, )
December 14, 2022 Filing 22 Letter from Robert D. Rhoad to Judge Clark regarding pro hac vice admission of counsel by consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert D. Rhoad, #2 Certification of Jonathan D.J. Loeb, #3 Certification of Luke M. Reilly, #4 Certification of Daniel R. Roberts, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(RHOAD, ROBERT)
November 17, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by SHARON K. GAGLIARDI on behalf of ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC (GAGLIARDI, SHARON)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/10/2022. (jd, )
November 10, 2022 Filing 19 Letter from Brian M. Goldberg to Judge Clark regarding Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER ORDER granting #17 request for a one-week extension of the proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/3/2022. (jd, )
November 3, 2022 Filing 17 Letter from Brian M. Goldberg to Judge Clark regarding deadline for DCO and ESI order. (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/20/2022. (jd, )
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Application admitting counsel pro hac vice STEVEN M. COYLE and NICHOLAS A. GEIGER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/24/2022. (jd, )
October 20, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Scheduling Conference held on 10/20/2022. (seb)
October 20, 2022 Filing 14 Letter from Cipla to the Hon. James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. Seeking Pro Hac Vice Admission of Counsel by Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rebekah Conroy, #2 Certification of Steven M. Coyle, #3 Certification of Nicholas A. Geiger, #4 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Counsel Pro Hac Vice by Consent)(CONROY, REBEKAH)
August 17, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC.(RHOAD, ROBERT)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/20/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark.). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/9/2022. (seb)
July 27, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC.. (CONROY, REBEKAH)
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC..(CONROY, REBEKAH)
July 13, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC., filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Certificate of Service)(RHOAD, ROBERT)
May 27, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. CIPLA USA, INC. waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (RHOAD, ROBERT)
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. CIPLA LIMITED waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (RHOAD, ROBERT)
May 16, 2022 Filing 6 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (JB, )
May 16, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
May 16, 2022 Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (jr)
May 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN JAY BLACK on behalf of ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC (BLACK, MARTIN)
May 13, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN M. GOLDBERG on behalf of ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
May 13, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC identifying Endo International PLC as Corporate Parent.. (RHOAD, ROBERT)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CIPLA LIMITED, CIPLA USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13409228), filed by PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC, PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(RHOAD, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. et al v. CIPLA LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: MARTIN JAY BLACK
Represented By: BRIAN M. GOLDBERG
Represented By: ROBERT D. RHOAD
Represented By: SHARON K. GAGLIARDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAR STERILE PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: MARTIN JAY BLACK
Represented By: ROBERT D. RHOAD
Represented By: BRIAN M. GOLDBERG
Represented By: SHARON K. GAGLIARDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENDO PAR INNOVATION COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: MARTIN JAY BLACK
Represented By: BRIAN M. GOLDBERG
Represented By: ROBERT D. RHOAD
Represented By: SHARON K. GAGLIARDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: CIPLA LIMITED
Represented By: REBEKAH R. CONROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIPLA USA, INC.
Represented By: REBEKAH R. CONROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?