MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. v. EL AVENTURERO IMPORTING AND EXPORTING INC.
Plaintiff: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.
Defendant: EL AVENTURERO IMPORTING AND EXPORTING INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02977
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 741 Shipping
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, El Aventurero Importing and Exporting Inc. by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.. Responses due by 8/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Proof, #2 Exhibit Invoice, #3 Exhibit Bill of Lading, #4 Exhibit Bill of Lading terms and conditions, #5 Certification of costs, #6 Exhibit Guaranteed Subpoena invoice, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(STEINBERG, RICK)
July 18, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, El Aventurero Importing and Exporting Inc.. Motion set for 8/15/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
July 8, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Default by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. against El Aventurero Importing and Exporting Inc.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
July 8, 2022 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EL AVENTURERO IMPORTING AND EXPORTING INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ld, )
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.. EL AVENTURERO IMPORTING AND EXPORTING INC. served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (STEINBERG, RICK)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EL AVENTURERO IMPORTING AND EXPORTING INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
May 24, 2022 Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. identifying MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. as Corporate Parent.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EL AVENTURERO IMPORTING AND EXPORTING INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13428107), filed by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Invoice, #2 Exhibit "B" Bill of Lading, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(STEINBERG, RICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. v. EL AVENTURERO IMPORTING AND EXPORTING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC.
Represented By: RICK A. STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL AVENTURERO IMPORTING AND EXPORTING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?