VANDERGROEF v. ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES
Plaintiff: CHARLES VANDERGROEF
Defendant: ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2022cv04642
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/9/2022. (dam)
September 8, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary w/o Prejudice by CHARLES VANDERGROEF. (TOSCANO, MATTHEW)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 Letter from M. Toscano. (TOSCANO, MATTHEW)
August 11, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
August 9, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice by ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (LUCKNER, STEVEN)
August 9, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Laura Vines in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Exhibit A)(LUCKNER, STEVEN)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES. (LUCKNER, STEVEN)
July 20, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 submitted by ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/9/2022. (sm)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES. (LUCKNER, STEVEN)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-003372-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13568532), filed by ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LUCKNER, STEVEN)
July 19, 2022 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VANDERGROEF v. ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES VANDERGROEF
Represented By: MATTHEW J. TOSCANO
Represented By: PATRICK P. TOSCANO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC AVIATION SERVICES
Represented By: STEVEN J. LUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?