WALEK v. PNC BNK et al
Plaintiff: MARIE SASHA WALEK
Defendant: PNC BNK, E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES and LUCIEN HODELIN
Case Number: 2:2022cv05742
Filed: September 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 1/11/23 at 10am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/16/22. (tjg, )
November 17, 2022 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
November 17, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 12/19/2022 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
November 16, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by PNC BNK. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Counsel with Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
November 1, 2022 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to E&L Appraisal Services and Lucien Hodelin. Attorney MAXWELL L. BILLEK for E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES,MAXWELL L. BILLEK for LUCIEN HODELIN added. (BILLEK, MAXWELL)
November 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MAXWELL L. BILLEK on behalf of E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES, LUCIEN HODELIN (BILLEK, MAXWELL)
November 1, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES, LUCIEN HODELIN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/29/2022. (lag, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to PNC Bank, N.A... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
October 31, 2022 Filing 8 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by PNC BNK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
October 31, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC BNK. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
October 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY on behalf of PNC BNK (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
October 31, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PNC BNK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/17/2022. (lag, )
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on E&L Appraisal Services on 10/11/2022, filed by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Lucien Hodelin on 10/11/2022, filed by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on PNC on 10.13.22, filed by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (MASCIOCCHI, THOMAS)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES, LUCIEN HODELIN, PNC BNK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
September 28, 2022 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
September 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES, LUCIEN HODELIN, PNC BNK ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13716832), filed by MARIE SASHA WALEK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Summons as to PNC, #5 Proposed Summons as to Lucien, #6 Proposed Summons as to E&L, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Filing Received via E-Mail)(dam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALEK v. PNC BNK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIE SASHA WALEK
Represented By: THOMAS GERARD MASCIOCCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC BNK
Represented By: WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&L APPRAISAL SERVICES
Represented By: MAXWELL L. BILLEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCIEN HODELIN
Represented By: MAXWELL L. BILLEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?