THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, AS SUBROGEE OF BLUE BLADE STEEL CORP. D/B/A BLUE BLADE STEEL v. EBNER INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH et al
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, AS SUBROGEE OF BLUE BLADE STEEL CORP. D/B/A BLUE BLADE STEEL
Defendant: EBNER INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH and EBNER FURNACES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv06175
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: William J Martini
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by EBNER FURNACES, INC..(OLIVER, PETER)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer by 30 days as to Defendant Ebner Furnaces, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/15/2022. (lag, )
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, and Order Extending Time to Answer by EBNER FURNACES, INC.. (KONTELY, FRANK)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, AS SUBROGEE OF BLUE BLADE STEEL CORP. D/B/A BLUE BLADE STEEL. EBNER FURNACES, INC. served on 10/24/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (PAOLINI, THOMAS)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, AS SUBROGEE OF BLUE BLADE STEEL CORP. D/B/A BLUE BLADE STEEL. EBNER INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH served on 10/24/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (PAOLINI, THOMAS)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EBNER FURNACES, INC., EBNER INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, AS SUBROGEE OF BLUE BLADE STEEL CORP. D/B/A BLUE BLADE STEEL identifying Plaintiff The Travelers Indemnity Company of America is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Travelers Property Casualty Corp., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of the Travelers Companies, Inc., a publicly traded corporation as Corporate Parent.. (PAOLINI, THOMAS)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EBNER FURNACES, INC., EBNER INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13770910) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, AS SUBROGEE OF BLUE BLADE STEEL CORP. D/B/A BLUE BLADE STEEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request for Issuance of Summons to Summons EBNER FURNACES, INC., #3 Summons Request for Issuance of Summons t EBNER INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH, #4 Summons Request for Issuance of Summons to EBNER INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH)(PAOLINI, THOMAS)
October 20, 2022 Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, AS SUBROGEE OF BLUE BLADE STEEL CORP. D/B/A BLUE BLADE STEEL v. EBNER INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, AS SUBROGEE OF BLUE BLADE STEEL CORP. D/B/A BLUE BLADE STEEL
Represented By: THOMAS PAOLINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBNER INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBNER FURNACES, INC.
Represented By: PETER K. OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?